This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/27/2021 at 08:59:09 (UTC).

Viasat, Inc. vs. Baylon

Case Summary

On 10/08/2020 Viasat, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Baylon. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Earl H. Maas, III. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-NC

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Earl H. Maas, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Viasat, Inc.

Defendant

Baylon, Marvin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Fontaine, Jennifer M.

At&T Building, 101 W Broadway 9Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

Connaughton, E Joseph

101 W Broadway Ninth Floor

San Diego, CA 92101-8285

Defendant Attorney

De Leon, Donald

1112 Montana Ave 110

Santa Monica, CA 90403

 

Court Documents

Notice of Related Case

Notice of Related Case filed by Viasat, Inc..

Motion to Compel Further Responses to RFPs

Motion to Compel Discovery (7/30/2021) filed by Viasat, Inc..

Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO MTC RFPs

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (7/30/2021) filed by Viasat, Inc..

Separate Statement ISO MTC RFPs

Separate Statement (7/30/2021) filed by Viasat, Inc..

Teich Declaration ISO MTC RFPs

Declaration - Other (of Andrea Teich 7/30/2021) filed by Viasat, Inc..

Fontaine Declaration ISO MTC RFPs

Declaration - Other (of Jennifer M Fontaine 7/30/2021) filed by Viasat, Inc..

Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits ISO MTC RFPs

Notice of Lodgment (7/30/2021) filed by Viasat, Inc..

Notice of Motion to Compel Deposition Question

Motion to Compel Discovery (8/6/2021) filed by Viasat, Inc..

Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO MTC Deposition question

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (8/6/2021) filed by Viasat, Inc..

Separate Statement ISO MTC Deposition Question

Separate Statement (8/6/2021) filed by Viasat, Inc..

Declaration of Jennifer Fontaine ISO MTC Deposition Question

Declaration - Other (of Jennifer M Fontaine 8/6/2021) filed by Viasat, Inc..

Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits ISO MTC Deposition Question

Notice of Lodgment (8/6/2021) filed by Viasat, Inc..

Opposition to Notice of Related Case

Opposition - Other (to Notice of Related Case) filed by Baylon, Marvin.

Motion to Compel Discovery Special Interrogtories

Motion to Compel Discovery (7/30/2021) filed by Viasat, Inc..

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (7/30/2021) filed by Viasat, Inc..

Separate Statement

Separate Statement (7/30/2021) filed by Viasat, Inc..

Ward Declaration In Support of Motion to Compel Discovery

Declaration - Other (of Colin L Ward 7/30/2021) filed by Viasat, Inc..

Fontaine Dec ISO Motion to Compel Discovery

Declaration - Other (of Jennifer M Fontaine 7/30/2021) filed by Viasat, Inc..

78 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 09/22/2022 at 09:15:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 08/12/2022 at 09:15:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Baylon, Marvin .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Viasat, Inc..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Viasat, Inc.. Refers to: Baylon, Marvin Filed By: Viasat, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Settlement Conference (Civil) heard 08/26/2021 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketBrief - Other (8/26 Settlement Conference) submitted by Viasat, Inc. received but not filed on 08/23/2021. Filed By: Viasat, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketPursuant to California Rules of Court 3.714, the Court, after having met and conferred with counsel, categorizes this case as one that will be disposed of within 18 months

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 09/22/2022 at 09:15AM before Judge Earl H. Maas, III.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 08/12/2022 at 09:15AM before Judge Earl H. Maas, III.

    Read MoreRead Less
97 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Preliminary Injunction (1/22/2021) filed by Viasat, Inc.. Filed By: Viasat, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 01/22/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Viasat, Inc.. Refers to: Baylon, Marvin Filed By: Viasat, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/06/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Viasat, Inc.. Refers to: Baylon, Marvin Filed By: Viasat, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Viasat, Inc.. Refers to: Baylon, Marvin Filed By: Viasat, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Viasat, Inc.. Refers to: Baylon, Marvin Filed By: Viasat, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Maas, Earl.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ViaSat, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fontaine, Jennifer M.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CONNAUGHTON E. JOSEPH