This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/25/2021 at 04:03:52 (UTC).

Viasat Inc vs Acacia Communications Inc

Case Summary

On 06/09/2020 Viasat Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Acacia Communications Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert P Dahlquist and Cynthia A. Freeland. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-NC

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Robert P Dahlquist

Cynthia A. Freeland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VIASAT INC

Defendant

Acacia Communications Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Warren, Matthew S

Attorney at WARREN LEX LLP

Warren, Erika H

Fitzgerald, Kenneth Moore

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Summons

Original Summons filed by VIASAT INC. Refers to: Acacia Communications Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by VIASAT INC. Refers to: Acacia Communications Inc

Complaint

Complaint filed by VIASAT INC. Refers to: Acacia Communications Inc

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by VIASAT INC. Refers to: Acacia Communications Inc

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/19/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Cynthia A. Freeland.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Judge Dahlquist, Robert P to Cynthia Freeland effective 01/25/2021

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by VIASAT INC. Refers to: Acacia Communications Inc Filed By: VIASAT INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Acacia Communications Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to VIASAT INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/19/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Cynthia A. Freeland was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/19/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Cynthia A. Freeland.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/05/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Judge Dahlquist, Robert P to Cynthia Freeland effective 01/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/05/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by VIASAT INC. Refers to: Acacia Communications Inc Filed By: VIASAT INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by VIASAT INC. Refers to: Acacia Communications Inc Filed By: VIASAT INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by VIASAT INC. Refers to: Acacia Communications Inc Filed By: VIASAT INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Dahlquist, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Acacia Communications Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where ViaSat, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fitzgerald, Kenneth Moore