This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/25/2021 at 03:51:05 (UTC).

ViaSat Inc vs ACACIA COMMUNICATIONS INC

Case Summary

On 06/09/2020 ViaSat Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ACACIA COMMUNICATIONS INC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert P Dahlquist and Timothy M. Casserly. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-NC

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Robert P Dahlquist

Timothy M. Casserly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ViaSat Inc

Defendant

Acacia Communications Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Warren, Matthew S.

Attorney at WARREN LEX LLP

Defendant Attorney

CASAMASSIMA, CHRISTOPHER T

Attorney at WILMER CUTLER PICKERING HALE AND DORR LLP

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Acacia Communications Inc.

Notice of Hearing

Demurrer (10/30/2020) filed by Acacia Communications Inc.

Proposed Order

Proposed Order submitted by Acacia Communications Inc received but not filed on 07/30/2020.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Christopher T Casamassima) filed by Acacia Communications Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Acacia Communications Inc.

JOINT STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due filed by ViaSat Inc; Acacia Communications Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by ViaSat Inc.

Notice of Related Case

Notice of Related Case filed by Acacia Communications Inc.

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due filed by Acacia Communications Inc; ViaSat Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Acacia Communications Inc.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference reassigned to Timothy M. Casserly for 12/18/2020 at 09:00:00 AM in N-31 at North County.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Judge Dahlquist, Robert P to Earl Maas effective 06/19/2020

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference reassigned to Earl H. Maas for 12/18/2020 at 10:00:00 AM in N-28 at North County.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Judge Dahlquist, Robert P to Timothy Casserly effective 06/22/2020

Complaint

Complaint filed by ViaSat Inc. Refers to: Acacia Communications Inc

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Acacia Communications Inc. Filed By: Acacia Communications Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/18/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketDemurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 10/30/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due filed by ViaSat Inc; Acacia Communications Inc. Filed By: ViaSat Inc (Plaintiff); Acacia Communications Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by ViaSat Inc. Filed By: ViaSat Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer (10/30/2020) filed by Acacia Communications Inc. Filed By: Acacia Communications Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order submitted by Acacia Communications Inc received but not filed on 07/30/2020. Filed By: Acacia Communications Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (Declaration of Christopher T Casamassima) filed by Acacia Communications Inc. Filed By: Acacia Communications Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Acacia Communications Inc. Filed By: Acacia Communications Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketThe Demurrer / Motion to Strike was rescheduled to 10/30/2020 at 01:30:00 PM in N-31 before Timothy M. Casserly at North County.

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case filed by Acacia Communications Inc. Filed By: Acacia Communications Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Acacia Communications Inc. Filed By: Acacia Communications Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by ViaSat Inc. Refers to: Acacia Communications Inc Filed By: ViaSat Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by ViaSat Inc. Refers to: Acacia Communications Inc Filed By: ViaSat Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by ViaSat Inc. Refers to: Acacia Communications Inc Filed By: ViaSat Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Dahlquist, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/18/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Acacia Communications Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where ViaSat, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan is a litigant