This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/20/2022 at 01:40:24 (UTC).

Veros Credit LLC VS M40 Body Shop

Case Summary

On 04/22/2022 Veros Credit LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against M40 Body Shop. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is James A Mangione. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

James A Mangione

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Veros Credit LLC

Defendant

M40 Body Shop

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Naples, Raymond J

2333 N Broadway Suite 400

Santa Ana, CA 92706

Tennant, Robert M

2333 N Broadway Suite 400

Santa Ana, CA 92706

Martinez, Kiana A

2333 N Broadway Suite 400

Santa Ana, CA 92706

 

Court Documents

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Veros Credit LLC. Refers to: M40 Body Shop

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Veros Credit LLC. Refers to: M40 Body Shop

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Veros Credit LLC. Refers to: M40 Body Shop

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Veros Credit LLC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-75; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Veros Credit LLC.; Filed By: Veros Credit LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Veros Credit LLC. Refers to: M40 Body Shop; Filed By: Veros Credit LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/23/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-75 James A Mangione.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Mangione, James.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Veros Credit LLC. Refers to: M40 Body Shop; Filed By: Veros Credit LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Veros Credit LLC. Refers to: M40 Body Shop; Filed By: Veros Credit LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Veros Credit, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kiana A. Martinez

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Raymond J. Naples