This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/25/2018 at 06:48:04 (UTC).

Venture Commerce Center East Lake Condominium Association vs. Alejandro Obeso

Case Summary

On 01/27/2009 Venture Commerce Center East Lake Condominium Association filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Alejandro Obeso. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************R-SC

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VENTURE COMMERCE CENTER EAST LAKE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION

Defendant

OBESO JR, ALEJANDRO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KORNHEISER, DEBORAH

Attorney at WASSERMAN KORNHEISER LLP

7955 Raytheon Rd

San Diego, CA 92111

Defendant Attorney

D'AMBROSIO, JAMES A

Attorney at STARK & D AMBROSIO LLP

501 W Broadway 960

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Case File Contents as of 04/28/17 - volume 1 of 1

Case File Contents as of 04/28/17 - volume 1 of 1

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/22/2009 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/22/2009 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/04/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/04/2010 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/08/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 03/08/2010 08:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Judgment Debtor Exam (Civil) heard 06/25/2010 09:15:00 AM.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case File Contents as of 04/28/17 - volume 1 of 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2012
  • Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied (san diego) filed by Venture Commerce Center East Lake Condominium Association. Refers to: Obeso, Alejandro Filed By: Venture Commerce Center East Lake Condominium Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2011
  • Writ of Execution issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Judgment Debtor Exam (Civil) heard 06/25/2010 09:15:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2010
  • Matter was taken off calendar. No proof of service filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2010
  • Order for Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2010
  • Judgment Debtor Exam (Civil) scheduled for 06/25/2010 at 09:15:00 AM at South County in S-01 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2010
  • Application and Order for Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor filed by Venture Commerce Center East Lake Condominium Association. Refers to: Obeso, Alejandro Filed By: Venture Commerce Center East Lake Condominium Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2010
  • Stipulation for Entry of Judgment filed by Venture Commerce Center East Lake Condominium Association. Refers to: Obeso, Alejandro Filed By: Venture Commerce Center East Lake Condominium Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2010
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/16/2010 at 08:35:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2009
  • Certificate of Progress: Inability to Serve (ORDER FOR PUBLICATION - GRANTED) filed by Venture Commerce Center East Lake Condominium Association. Refers to: Obeso, Alejandro Filed By: Venture Commerce Center East Lake Condominium Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2009
  • Order for Publication of Summons/Citation filed by Venture Commerce Center East Lake Condominium Association. Refers to: Obeso, Alejandro Filed By: Venture Commerce Center East Lake Condominium Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2009
  • Application for Order for Publication of Summons/Citation filed by Venture Commerce Center East Lake Condominium Association. Refers to: Obeso, Alejandro Filed By: Venture Commerce Center East Lake Condominium Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2009
  • Certificate of Progress: Inability to Serve (Extension to file certificate of service granted up to 6/8/09 (30 days, final)) filed by Venture Commerce Center East Lake Condominium Association. Refers to: Obeso, Alejandro Filed By: Venture Commerce Center East Lake Condominium Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2009
  • Certificate of Progress: Inability to Serve (Extension to file certificate of service granted up to 5/1/09 (30 days)) filed by Venture Commerce Center East Lake Condominium Association. Refers to: Obeso, Alejandro Filed By: Venture Commerce Center East Lake Condominium Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2009
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Cannon, William.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2009
  • Original Summons filed by Venture Commerce Center East Lake Condominium Association. Refers to: Obeso, Alejandro Filed By: Venture Commerce Center East Lake Condominium Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2009
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Venture Commerce Center East Lake Condominium Association. Refers to: Obeso, Alejandro Filed By: Venture Commerce Center East Lake Condominium Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2009
  • Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Venture Commerce Center East Lake Condominium Association. Refers to: Obeso, Alejandro Filed By: Venture Commerce Center East Lake Condominium Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2009
  • Case details updated.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.