This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/29/2021 at 10:36:02 (UTC).

Ventura vs RN Motors Inc

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 Ventura filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RN Motors Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Matthew C. Braner and Kenneth J Medel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Matthew C. Braner

Kenneth J Medel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ventura, Leonardo

Defendants

RN Motors Inc; DBA : La Mesa Preowned

Surety

American Safety Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sadr, Kasra

1455 Frazee Road Mission Valley, Suite 500

San Diego, CA 92108

Defendant Attorneys

Albut, Christian J

Attorney at ALBUT LAW PC

11452-11682, El Camino Real

San Diego, CA 92130

Gascou, Christian

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Medel,Kenneth to Braner,Matthew effective 11/11/2021

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Court Trial assigned to Matthew C. Braner for 05/06/2022 at 09:00:00 AM in C-60 at Central was vacated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) assigned to Matthew C. Braner for 04/22/2022 at 09:00:00 AM in C-60 at Central was vacated.

Answer

Answer filed by American Safety Casualty Insurance Company.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Ventura, Leonardo. Refers to: Surety

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Ventura, Leonardo.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by American Safety Casualty Insurance Company.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by RN Motors Inc.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/03/2021 08:30:00 AM.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Ventura, Leonardo.

Answer

Answer filed by RN Motors Inc.

Amendment to Complaint

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (DOE 31) filed by Ventura, Leonardo. Refers to: Surety; American Safety Casualty Insurance Company; RN Motors Inc

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

[A document for ROA# 1]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ventura, Leonardo. Refers to: RN Motors Inc; Surety

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Ventura, Leonardo. Refers to: RN Motors Inc; Surety

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Court Trial reassigned to Braner, Matthew for 05/06/2022 at 09:00:00 AM in C-60 at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) reassigned to Braner, Matthew for 04/22/2022 at 09:00:00 AM in C-60 at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Medel,Kenneth to Braner,Matthew effective 11/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Court Trial assigned to Matthew C. Braner for 05/06/2022 at 09:00:00 AM in C-60 at Central was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) assigned to Matthew C. Braner for 04/22/2022 at 09:00:00 AM in C-60 at Central was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketPursuant to California Rules of Court 3.714, the Court, after having met and conferred with counsel, categorizes this case as one that will be disposed of within 18 months

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Court Trial scheduled for 05/06/2022 at 09:00AM before Judge Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 04/22/2022 at 09:00AM before Judge Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/03/2021 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by RN Motors Inc. Filed By: RN Motors Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Ventura, Leonardo. Filed By: Ventura, Leonardo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 1]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Ventura, Leonardo. Refers to: RN Motors Inc; Surety; American Safety Casualty Insurance Company Filed By: Ventura, Leonardo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ventura, Leonardo. Refers to: RN Motors Inc; Surety Filed By: Ventura, Leonardo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 3]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Ventura, Leonardo. Refers to: RN Motors Inc; Surety Filed By: Ventura, Leonardo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Medel, Kenneth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/03/2021 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RN Motors Inc; DBA : LA MESA PREOWNED;AKA : THE CAR FOR LESS is a litigant

Latest cases where SURETY is a litigant

Latest cases where American Safety Casualty Insurance Company, is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALBUT CHRISTIAN JOSEPH