This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/12/2023 at 07:05:08 (UTC).

Velocity Investments LLC vs Galindo

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 Velocity Investments LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Galindo. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Loren G. Freestone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Loren G. Freestone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Velocity Investments LLC

Defendant

Galindo, Marco

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mandarich, Christopher D

Attorney at P O

109032

Chicago, IL 60610

Defendant Attorney

Grace, Scott M

Attorney at GRACE LAW APC

1958 Sunset Cliffs Blvd

San Diego, CA 92107

 

Court Documents

Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees

Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees filed by Velocity Investments LLC. Refers to: Galindo, Marco

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Velocity Investments LLC. Refers to: Galindo, Marco

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Velocity Investments LLC. Refers to: Galindo, Marco

Re: Filling Fee Reduction

Declaration - Other filed by Velocity Investments LLC. Refers to: Galindo, Marco

Re: Venue

Statement of Venue filed by Velocity Investments LLC. Refers to: Galindo, Marco

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Velocity Investments LLC.

Answer

Answer filed by Galindo, Marco.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Galindo, Marco.

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by Galindo, Marco.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver filed by Galindo, Marco.; Filed By: Galindo, Marco (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Galindo, Marco.; Filed By: Galindo, Marco (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail filed by Galindo, Marco.; Filed By: Galindo, Marco (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Galindo, Marco.; Filed By: Galindo, Marco (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Velocity Investments LLC.; Filed By: Velocity Investments LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Freestone, Loren.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Venue filed by Velocity Investments LLC. Refers to: Galindo, Marco; Filed By: Velocity Investments LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by Velocity Investments LLC. Refers to: Galindo, Marco; Filed By: Velocity Investments LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Velocity Investments LLC. Refers to: Galindo, Marco; Filed By: Velocity Investments LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Velocity Investments LLC. Refers to: Galindo, Marco; Filed By: Velocity Investments LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees filed by Velocity Investments LLC. Refers to: Galindo, Marco; Filed By: Velocity Investments LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less