This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 10/08/2021 at 01:37:48 (UTC).

Vega vs Gilead Sciences Inc

Case Summary

On 09/10/2021 Vega filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against Gilead Sciences Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth J Medel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kenneth J Medel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Atkinson, Lillie

Bell, Ronnie

Bryfogle, Gary

Devenport, Cynthia

Foster, Barbara

Gennimi, John

Gibson, Marty

HURTADO, CRISTINA

Holt, William

Howard, LM

Howe, Timothy

Hunt Williams, Aileene

King, Johnny

McNeil, Jerome

Mediola, Miguel

Michael Carr obo Estate of Ronnie Summers

Minniear, Thomas

Norman, James

Robinson, Claude

Defendant

Gilead Sciences Inc

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Graham, M Elizabeth

Attorney at One Market Street Spear Tower

 

Court Documents

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Hunt Williams, Aileene; Varney, Aric; Foster, Barbara; Robinson, Claude; HURTADO, CRISTINA; Devenport, Cynthia; Rodriguez, Frank; Bryfogle, Gary; Norman, James; Steadman, Jane;OTHERS. Refers to: Gilead Sciences Inc

Complaint

Complaint filed by Vega, Jose; Hunt Williams, Aileene; Varney, Aric; Foster, Barbara; Robinson, Claude; HURTADO, CRISTINA; Devenport, Cynthia; Rodriguez, Frank; Bryfogle, Gary; Norman, James;OTHERS. Refers to: Gilead Sciences Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Vega, Jose; Hunt Williams, Aileene; Varney, Aric; Foster, Barbara; Robinson, Claude; HURTADO, CRISTINA; Devenport, Cynthia; Rodriguez, Frank; Bryfogle, Gary; Norman, James;OTHERS. Refers to: Gilead Sciences Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Vega, Jose; Hunt Williams, Aileene; Varney, Aric; Foster, Barbara; Robinson, Claude; HURTADO, CRISTINA; Devenport, Cynthia; Rodriguez, Frank; Bryfogle, Gary; Norman, James;OTHERS. Refers to: Gilead Sciences Inc

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-66; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Hunt Williams, Aileene; Varney, Aric; Foster, Barbara; Robinson, Claude; HURTADO, CRISTINA; Devenport, Cynthia; Rodriguez, Frank; Bryfogle, Gary; Norman, James; Steadman, Jane;OTHERS. Refers to: Gilead Sciences Inc Filed By: Hunt Williams, Aileene (Plaintiff); Varney, Aric (Plaintiff); Foster, Barbara (Plaintiff); Robinson, Claude (Plaintiff); HURTADO, CRISTINA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/06/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Vega, Jose; Hunt Williams, Aileene; Varney, Aric; Foster, Barbara; Robinson, Claude; HURTADO, CRISTINA; Devenport, Cynthia; Rodriguez, Frank; Bryfogle, Gary; Norman, James;OTHERS. Refers to: Gilead Sciences Inc Filed By: Vega, Jose (Plaintiff); Hunt Williams, Aileene (Plaintiff); Varney, Aric (Plaintiff); Foster, Barbara (Plaintiff); Robinson, Claude (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Vega, Jose; Hunt Williams, Aileene; Varney, Aric; Foster, Barbara; Robinson, Claude; HURTADO, CRISTINA; Devenport, Cynthia; Rodriguez, Frank; Bryfogle, Gary; Norman, James;OTHERS. Refers to: Gilead Sciences Inc Filed By: Vega, Jose (Plaintiff); Hunt Williams, Aileene (Plaintiff); Varney, Aric (Plaintiff); Foster, Barbara (Plaintiff); Robinson, Claude (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Vega, Jose; Hunt Williams, Aileene; Varney, Aric; Foster, Barbara; Robinson, Claude; HURTADO, CRISTINA; Devenport, Cynthia; Rodriguez, Frank; Bryfogle, Gary; Norman, James;OTHERS. Refers to: Gilead Sciences Inc Filed By: Vega, Jose (Plaintiff); Hunt Williams, Aileene (Plaintiff); Varney, Aric (Plaintiff); Foster, Barbara (Plaintiff); Robinson, Claude (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Medel, Kenneth.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gilead Sciences, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRAHAM, M. ELIZABETH