This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/27/2021 at 06:43:24 (UTC).

Vargas vs David J. Bainer D.D.S. Inc

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 Vargas filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against David J Bainer D D S Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacqueline M. Stern and Cynthia A. Freeland. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************T-NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Jacqueline M. Stern

Cynthia A. Freeland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vargas, Alejandra

Defendants

David J. Bainer D.D.S. Inc; DBA : The Smile Gallery

Bainer, David J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jafari, Eamon

Attorney at BARRINGTON LEGAL INC

11601 Wilshire Boulevard 5Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorney

Besser, Lara P.

4365 Executive Drive 950

San Diego, CA 92121

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Bainer, David J; David J. Bainer D.D.S. Inc.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 03/26/2021 09:00:00 AM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Order to Appear SD

Order to Appear SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 05/14/2021 09:00:00 AM.

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal (not entered) filed by Vargas, Alejandra.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Vargas, Alejandra.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Vargas, Alejandra. Refers to: David J. Bainer D.D.S. Inc; Bainer, David

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Vargas, Alejandra.

Answer

Answer filed by Bainer, David J; David J. Bainer D.D.S. Inc.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Vargas, Alejandra. Refers to: Bainer, David; David J. Bainer D.D.S. Inc

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Vargas, Alejandra. Refers to: Bainer, David; David J. Bainer D.D.S. Inc

Complaint

Complaint filed by Vargas, Alejandra. Refers to: David J. Bainer D.D.S. Inc; Bainer, David

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Vargas, Alejandra. Refers to: David J. Bainer D.D.S. Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Vargas, Alejandra. Refers to: David J. Bainer D.D.S. Inc

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to David J. Bainer D.D.S. Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Bainer, David J .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Vargas, Alejandra .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Vargas, Alejandra. Refers to: David J. Bainer D.D.S. Inc; Bainer, David Filed By: Vargas, Alejandra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Vargas, Alejandra. Filed By: Vargas, Alejandra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (not entered) filed by Vargas, Alejandra. Filed By: Vargas, Alejandra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Vargas, Alejandra. Filed By: Vargas, Alejandra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketOSC - Sanctions set for 05/14/2021 at 9:00 am vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 05/14/2021 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference reassigned to Freeland, Cynthia for 03/26/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in N-27 at North County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2020
  • DocketCase reassigned from Stern,Jacqueline to Freeland,Cynthia effective 11/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/26/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Vargas, Alejandra. Refers to: David J. Bainer D.D.S. Inc; Bainer, David Filed By: Vargas, Alejandra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Vargas, Alejandra. Refers to: David J. Bainer D.D.S. Inc Filed By: Vargas, Alejandra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Vargas, Alejandra. Refers to: David J. Bainer D.D.S. Inc Filed By: Vargas, Alejandra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Stern, Jacqueline.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAFARI EAMON ESQ.