This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/08/2020 at 08:12:06 (UTC).

Valley Active Properties LLC vs Renteria

Case Summary

On 09/12/2019 Valley Active Properties LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against Renteria. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Valley Active Properties LLC

Defendant

Renteria, Reyna

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Navis, Glen M

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF GLEN M NAVIS

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution for Possession of the Premises

Writ of Execution for Possession of the Premises submitted by Valley Active Properties LLC received but not filed on 11/05/2019.

Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only

Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only filed by Valley Active Properties LLC. Refers to: Renteria, Reyna

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (Entered as to named defendant) filed by Valley Active Properties LLC. Refers to: Renteria, Reyna

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

[Another document for ROA# 11]

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 11]

Notice to Filing Party SD

The default filed by was denied. Refers to: Renteria, Reyna

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Valley Active Properties LLC.

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Reyna Renteria) filed by Valley Active Properties LLC. Refers to: Renteria, Reyna

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (Entered as to Unknown Occupants only) filed by Valley Active Properties LLC. Refers to: Renteria, Reyna

Notice that you have been sued SD

Case initiation form printed.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Valley Active Properties LLC. Refers to: Renteria, Reyna

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Valley Active Properties LLC. Refers to: Renteria, Reyna

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Valley Active Properties LLC. Refers to: Renteria, Reyna

Writ of Possession Returned - Wholly Satisfied

Writ of Possession Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed by Valley Active Properties LLC.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed by Valley Active Properties LLC. Filed By: Valley Active Properties LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only filed by Valley Active Properties LLC. Refers to: Renteria, Reyna Filed By: Valley Active Properties LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketJudgment entered for Valley Active Properties LLC and against Renteria, Reyna for a grand total of $ 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution for Possession of the Premises submitted by Valley Active Properties LLC received but not filed on 11/05/2019. Filed By: Valley Active Properties LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (Entered as to named defendant) filed by Valley Active Properties LLC. Refers to: Renteria, Reyna Filed By: Valley Active Properties LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketDefault entered as to Renteria, Reyna on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Valley Active Properties LLC .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe default filed by was denied. Refers to: Renteria, Reyna Filed By: Valley Active Properties LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 11]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 11]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (Entered as to Unknown Occupants only) filed by Valley Active Properties LLC. Refers to: Renteria, Reyna Filed By: Valley Active Properties LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Reyna Renteria) filed by Valley Active Properties LLC. Refers to: Renteria, Reyna Filed By: Valley Active Properties LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Valley Active Properties LLC. Filed By: Valley Active Properties LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Valley Active Properties LLC. Refers to: Renteria, Reyna Filed By: Valley Active Properties LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Valley Active Properties LLC. Refers to: Renteria, Reyna Filed By: Valley Active Properties LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Valley Active Properties LLC. Refers to: Renteria, Reyna Filed By: Valley Active Properties LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-60.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VALLEY ACTIVE PROPERTIES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NAVIS, GLEN M.