Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 06/15/2021 at 08:32:58 (UTC).

Valencia vs Vista Hill Foundation

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 Valencia filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Vista Hill Foundation. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Joel R. Wohlfeil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Joel R. Wohlfeil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Valencia, Dalila

Defendant

Vista Hill Foundation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rastegar, Farzad

Defendant Attorney

Carter, Kathleen

 

Court Documents

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Vista Hill Foundation.

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint for Dalila Valencia v Vista Hill Foundation

Proof of Service filed by Valencia, Dalila.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Valencia, Dalila. Refers to: Vista Hill Foundation

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Valencia, Dalila. Refers to: Vista Hill Foundation

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Valencia, Dalila. Refers to: Vista Hill Foundation

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Vista Hill Foundation. Filed By: Vista Hill Foundation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Valencia, Dalila. Filed By: Valencia, Dalila (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/20/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Valencia, Dalila. Refers to: Vista Hill Foundation Filed By: Valencia, Dalila (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Valencia, Dalila. Refers to: Vista Hill Foundation Filed By: Valencia, Dalila (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Valencia, Dalila. Refers to: Vista Hill Foundation Filed By: Valencia, Dalila (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vista Hill Foundation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RASTEGAR FARZAD