Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/29/2021 at 07:39:08 (UTC).

Valdez vs JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 Valdez filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JOHNSON JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Joel R. Wohlfeil. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Joel R. Wohlfeil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Valdez, Manuel

Defendant

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Singleton, Gerald

Attorney at SINGLETON SCHREIBER MCKENZIE & SCOTT LLP

Defendant Attorney

Weissenberger, Emily M.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Valdez, Manuel. Refers to: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC

Complaint

Complaint filed by Valdez, Manuel. Refers to: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Valdez, Manuel.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Valdez, Manuel.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/10/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court filed by JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. Filed By: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Valdez, Manuel. Refers to: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC Filed By: Valdez, Manuel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/10/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Valdez, Manuel. Refers to: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC Filed By: Valdez, Manuel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Valdez, Manuel. Filed By: Valdez, Manuel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Valdez, Manuel. Filed By: Valdez, Manuel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEISSENBERGER EMILY