This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/05/2021 at 10:42:59 (UTC).

USA Waste of California Inc t/a Waste Management of El Cajon San Diego vs Viet Hung LLC

Case Summary

On 07/14/2021 USA Waste of California Inc t/a Waste Management of El Cajon San Diego filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Viet Hung LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

USA Waste of California Inc T/A Waste Management of El Cajon San Diego

Defendants

Viet Hung LLC

Vu, Huynh Manh; AKA : Manh Vu, Huynh

Vu, Lien Hoa; AKA : Vu, Lillian

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rentto, Robert L

3517 S Camino Del Rio 412

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by USA Waste of California Inc T/A Waste Management of El Cajon San Diego. Refers to: Viet Hung LLC; Vu, Lien; Vu, Huynh

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by USA Waste of California Inc T/A Waste Management of El Cajon San Diego. Refers to: Viet Hung LLC; Vu, Lien; Vu, Huynh

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by USA Waste of California Inc T/A Waste Management of El Cajon San Diego. Refers to: Viet Hung LLC; Vu, Lien; Vu, Huynh

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by USA Waste of California Inc T/A Waste Management of El Cajon San Diego.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by USA Waste of California Inc T/A Waste Management of El Cajon San Diego. Refers to: Vu, Huynh

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by USA Waste of California Inc T/A Waste Management of El Cajon San Diego. Refers to: Vu, Lien

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by USA Waste of California Inc T/A Waste Management of El Cajon San Diego. Refers to: Viet Hung LLC

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by USA Waste of California Inc T/A Waste Management of El Cajon San Diego. Filed By: USA Waste of California Inc T/A Waste Management of El Cajon San Diego (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Viet Hung LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Vu, Lien Hoa .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Vu, Huynh Manh .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to USA Waste of California Inc T/A Waste Management of El Cajon San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by USA Waste of California Inc T/A Waste Management of El Cajon San Diego. Refers to: Viet Hung LLC Filed By: USA Waste of California Inc T/A Waste Management of El Cajon San Diego (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by USA Waste of California Inc T/A Waste Management of El Cajon San Diego. Refers to: Vu, Lien Filed By: USA Waste of California Inc T/A Waste Management of El Cajon San Diego (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by USA Waste of California Inc T/A Waste Management of El Cajon San Diego. Refers to: Vu, Huynh Filed By: USA Waste of California Inc T/A Waste Management of El Cajon San Diego (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by USA Waste of California Inc T/A Waste Management of El Cajon San Diego. Refers to: Viet Hung LLC; Vu, Lien; Vu, Huynh Filed By: USA Waste of California Inc T/A Waste Management of El Cajon San Diego (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by USA Waste of California Inc T/A Waste Management of El Cajon San Diego. Refers to: Viet Hung LLC; Vu, Lien; Vu, Huynh Filed By: USA Waste of California Inc T/A Waste Management of El Cajon San Diego (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by USA Waste of California Inc T/A Waste Management of El Cajon San Diego. Refers to: Viet Hung LLC; Vu, Lien; Vu, Huynh Filed By: USA Waste of California Inc T/A Waste Management of El Cajon San Diego (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rentto, Robert L.