This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/01/2019 at 02:19:51 (UTC).

U.S. Bank National Association vs. Melchor Quevedo

Case Summary

On 01/19/2010 U S Bank National Association filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Melchor Quevedo. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************D-SC

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendant

QUEVEDO, MELCHOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEYLER, DANA J

Attorney at BARRETT DAFFIN FRAPPIER TREDER & WEISS LLP

20955 Pathfinder Road 300

Diamond Bar, CA 91765

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 06/25/2010 09:00:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Unlawful Detainer Court Trial heard 05/03/2010 09:00:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Demurrer / Motion to Strike heard 03/05/2010 09:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Unlawful Detainer Court Trial heard 05/03/2010 09:00:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 06/25/2010 09:00:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Demurrer / Motion to Strike heard 03/19/2010 09:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed (Unlawful Detainer) scheduled for 05/21/2010 at 09:15:00 AM at South County in S-02 .

Notice of Hearing SD

Unlawful Detainer Court Trial scheduled for 05/03/2010 at 09:00:00 AM at South County in S-02 .

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 06/11/2010 09:00:00 AM.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 06/25/2010 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 06/25/2010 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2010
  • The Motion to Extend Lockout Date was DENIED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2010
  • Ex Parte scheduled for 06/25/2010 at 09:00:00 AM at South County in S-02 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2010
  • Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Quevedo, Melchor. Refers to: US Bank National Association Filed By: Quevedo, Melchor (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 06/11/2010 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2010
  • The Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Extend Lock-Out Date Until 6/30/2010 was granted upon payment of $1140. to the Plaintiff by the end of today .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2010
  • Ex Parte scheduled for 06/11/2010 at 09:00:00 AM at South County in S-02 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2010
  • Ex Parte reassigned to for 06/11/2010 at 09:00:00 AM in S-02 at South County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2010
  • Ex Parte scheduled for 06/11/2010 at 09:00:00 AM at South County in S-01 .

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 02/12/2010
  • Demurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 03/05/2010 at 09:30:00 AM at South County in S-02 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2010
  • Affidavit - Other (of Melchor Quevedo in support of notice of special demurrer to complaint) filed by U.S. Bank National Association. Refers to: Quevedo, Melchor Filed By: US Bank National Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2010
  • Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by U.S. Bank National Association. Refers to: Quevedo, Melchor Filed By: US Bank National Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2010
  • Demurrer (Motion to quash service of summons) filed by U.S. Bank National Association. Refers to: Quevedo, Melchor Filed By: US Bank National Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2010
  • Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by U.S. Bank National Association. Refers to: Quevedo, Melchor Filed By: US Bank National Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2010
  • Case assigned to Department S-02.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2010
  • Original Summons filed by U.S. Bank National Association. Refers to: Quevedo, Melchor Filed By: US Bank National Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2010
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by U.S. Bank National Association. Refers to: Quevedo, Melchor Filed By: US Bank National Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2010
  • Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by U.S. Bank National Association. Refers to: Quevedo, Melchor Filed By: US Bank National Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2010
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.