This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 09/12/2021 at 07:06:59 (UTC).

US Bank National Association VS Casinger

Case Summary

On 07/14/2021 US Bank National Association filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Casinger. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US Bank National Association

Defendant

Casinger, Christopher M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anikstein, Max

Attorney at ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES P C

 

Court Documents

Declaration of Non-Service

Declaration of Non-Service filed by US Bank National Association. Refers to: Casinger, Christopher

Declaration of Non-Service

Declaration of Non-Service filed by US Bank National Association. Refers to: Casinger, Christopher

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by US Bank National Association. Refers to: Casinger, Christopher

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by US Bank National Association. Refers to: Casinger, Christopher

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by US Bank National Association. Refers to: Casinger, Christopher

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service filed by US Bank National Association. Refers to: Casinger, Christopher Filed By: US Bank National Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service filed by US Bank National Association. Refers to: Casinger, Christopher Filed By: US Bank National Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by US Bank National Association. Refers to: Casinger, Christopher Filed By: US Bank National Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by US Bank National Association. Refers to: Casinger, Christopher Filed By: US Bank National Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by US Bank National Association. Refers to: Casinger, Christopher Filed By: US Bank National Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank National Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anikstein, Max