This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/19/2020 at 01:35:06 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION vs 91 ENTERPRISES LLC

Case Summary

On 08/15/2019 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 91 ENTERPRISES LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy Taylor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Timothy Taylor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

ERLICH, GILAD

ELIMELECH, ASHER

91 ENTERPRISES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Markow, Gregory S

Attorney at CGS

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. Refers to: 91 ENTERPRISES LLC; ERLICH, GILAD; ELIMELECH, ASHER

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. Refers to: 91 ENTERPRISES LLC; ERLICH, GILAD; ELIMELECH, ASHER

Complaint

Complaint filed by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. Refers to: 91 ENTERPRISES LLC; ERLICH, GILAD; ELIMELECH, ASHER

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. Refers to: ERLICH, GILAD; ELIMELECH, ASHER; 91 ENTERPRISES LLC

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. Refers to: ERLICH, GILAD; ELIMELECH, ASHER; 91 ENTERPRISES LLC

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. Refers to: ERLICH, GILAD; ELIMELECH, ASHER; 91 ENTERPRISES LLC

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. Refers to: ERLICH, GILAD; ELIMELECH, ASHER; 91 ENTERPRISES LLC Filed By: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. Refers to: ERLICH, GILAD; ELIMELECH, ASHER; 91 ENTERPRISES LLC Filed By: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. Refers to: ERLICH, GILAD; ELIMELECH, ASHER; 91 ENTERPRISES LLC Filed By: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/17/2020 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Taylor, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. Refers to: 91 ENTERPRISES LLC; ERLICH, GILAD; ELIMELECH, ASHER Filed By: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. Refers to: 91 ENTERPRISES LLC; ERLICH, GILAD; ELIMELECH, ASHER Filed By: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. Refers to: 91 ENTERPRISES LLC; ERLICH, GILAD; ELIMELECH, ASHER Filed By: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 91 ENTERPRISE LLC. DBA BRILLIANCE NEW YORK is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank National Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARKOW, GREGORY