This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 09/15/2019 at 02:31:43 (UTC).

UNITED STATES AVIATION vs APICAL INDUSTRIES INC

Case Summary

On 11/13/2018 UNITED STATES AVIATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against APICAL INDUSTRIES INC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JACQUELINE M. STERN. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************P-NC

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JACQUELINE M. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED STATES AVIATION UNDERWRITERS INC

Defendant

APICAL INDUSTRIES INC; DBA : DART AEROSPACE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HEMBREE, JONATHAN E

Defendant Attorney

MONTANARI, GARRY L.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling filed by Apical Industries Inc.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Reply to Opposition - Other

Reply to Opposition - Other filed by Apical Industries Inc.

Declaration Of Michael Terhar In Support Of Motion To Permit Ross Cunningham To Appear As Counsel Pro Hac Vice; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities

Declaration - Other (10/11/2019) filed by United States Aviation Underwriters Inc.

Declaration Of Ross Cunningham In Support Of Motion To Permit Ross Cunningham To Appear As Counsel Pro Hac Vice; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities

Declaration - Other (10/11/2019) filed by United States Aviation Underwriters Inc.

[Proposed] Order Granting Ex Parte Application of Ross Cunningham To Appear As Counsel Pro Hac Vice

Order - Other (8/20) filed by United States Aviation Underwriters Inc.

Plaintiff United States Aviation Underwriters Inc.s Opposition to Defendant Apical Industries Incs Motion to Stay or Dismiss Action on The Ground of Forum Non Conveniens And Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof

Opposition - Other (08/30/2019) filed by United States Aviation Underwriters Inc.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Apical Industries Inc.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 08/30/2019 at 01:30:00 PM in N-27 before Jacqueline M. Stern at North County.

Notice of Motion and Motion to Stay or Dismissa Action on Ground of Forum Non Conveniens

Motion - Other (08/23/19) filed by Apical Industries Inc.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 06/11/2019 08:30:00 AM.

Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice (3/29/19) filed by United States Aviation Underwriters Inc.

Declaration of Jonathan Hembree

Declaration - Other (3/29/19) filed by United States Aviation Underwriters Inc.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Demurrer / Motion to Strike heard 03/29/2019 01:30:00 PM.

Notice - of Filing Appendix of Non-California cases for demurrer

Notice - Other filed by Apical Industries Inc.

Complaint In Subrogation; Demand for Jury Trial

Complaint filed by United States Aviation Underwriters Inc. Refers to: Apical Industries Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by United States Aviation Underwriters Inc. Refers to: Apical Industries Inc

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Ruling filed by Apical Industries Inc. Filed By: Apical Industries Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 10/11/2019 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/10/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 08/30/2019 01:30:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/30/2019 01:30:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • Civil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to party's motion to 01/10/2020 at 09:00AM before Judge Jacqueline M. Stern.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Monique Minahan, CSR No. 10818) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2019
  • Demurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 03/29/2019 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint; Order) filed by Apical Industries Inc. Filed By: Apical Industries Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed by United States Aviation Underwriters Inc. Filed By: United States Aviation Underwriters Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/02/2019 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Stern, Jacqueline.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Summons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by United States Aviation Underwriters Inc. Refers to: Apical Industries Inc Filed By: United States Aviation Underwriters Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by United States Aviation Underwriters Inc. Refers to: Apical Industries Inc Filed By: United States Aviation Underwriters Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by United States Aviation Underwriters Inc. Refers to: Apical Industries Inc Filed By: United States Aviation Underwriters Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less