This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 10/16/2022 at 07:23:44 (UTC).

UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY vs Kuykendall

Case Summary

On 08/17/2022 UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Kuykendall. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John S. Meyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

John S. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

Kuykendall, John Brent

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAM, JUDY

Attorney at RUTTER HOBBS & DAVIDOFF INC

1011 Santa Monica Boulevard 550

Santa Monica, CA 90401

 

Court Documents

Complaint (Case Initiation)

Complaint filed by UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. Refers to: Kuykendall, John

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. Refers to: Kuykendall, John

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. Refers to: Kuykendall, John

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. Refers to: Kuykendall, John

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. Refers to: Kuykendall, John; Filed By: UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/03/2023 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. Refers to: Kuykendall, John; Filed By: UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. Refers to: Kuykendall, John; Filed By: UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. Refers to: Kuykendall, John; Filed By: UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United of Omaha Life Insurance Company is a litigant