This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/05/2019 at 03:17:34 (UTC).

Union Adjustment Co., Inc. vs. Maria Gamalinda

Case Summary

On 03/25/2010 Union Adjustment Co , Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Maria Gamalinda. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-SC

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNION ADJUSTMENT CO INC

Defendants

GAMALINDA, MARIA ; AKA : TUNGOL GAMALINDA, MARIA VIOLETA

GAMALINDA, GLENN A; AKA : GAMALINDA, GLENN G;AKA : GAMALINDA, GLENN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DIX, LLOYD DOUGLAS

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF LLOYD DOUGLAS DIX

DIX, LLOYD D

26610 Agoura Rd Suite 209

Calabasas, CA 91302

 

Court Documents

Case File Contents as of 06/15/17 - volume 1 of 1

Case File Contents as of 06/15/17 - volume 1 of 1

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Notice of Hearing SD

Default Prove-Up Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2011 at 10:00:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Default Prove-Up Hearing heard 06/23/2011 10:00:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 08/01/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed heard 08/01/2011 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Default Prove-Up Hearing heard 09/21/2011 09:00:00 AM.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case File Contents as of 06/15/17 - volume 1 of 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2012
  • Writ of Execution issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2011
  • Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Union Adjustment Co Inc and against Gamalinda, Glenn A ;Gamalinda, Maria for $ 27486.58, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 1949.74, interest: $ 12951.44, prejudgment costs: $ 454.50, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 42842.26.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2011
  • Judgment by Default by Court filed by Union Adjustment Co Inc. Refers to: Gamalinda, Maria; Gamalinda, Glenn Filed By: Union Adjustment Co Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2011
  • Case sent to Judge Cannon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2011
  • Case located in Court Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Default Prove-Up Hearing heard 09/21/2011 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed heard 08/01/2011 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2011
  • Default Prove-Up Hearing scheduled for 09/21/2011 at 09:00AM before Judge William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2010
  • The default filed by Union Adjustment Co Inc was entered as to Gamalinda, Maria; Gamalinda, Glenn A on Complaint . Override feature used.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2010
  • Request for Entry of Default filed by Union Adjustment Co Inc. Refers to: Gamalinda, Maria; Gamalinda, Glenn Filed By: Union Adjustment Co Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2010
  • Location changed from Shelf to Court Judgment desk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Union Adjustment Co., Inc.. Refers to: Gamalinda, Maria Filed By: Union Adjustment Co Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2010
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Union Adjustment Co., Inc.. Refers to: Gamalinda, Glenn Filed By: Union Adjustment Co Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2010
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Cannon, William.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2010
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Union Adjustment Co., Inc.. Refers to: Gamalinda, Maria; Gamalinda, Glenn Filed By: Union Adjustment Co Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2010
  • Complaint filed by Union Adjustment Co., Inc.. Refers to: Gamalinda, Maria; Gamalinda, Glenn Filed By: Union Adjustment Co Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2010
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.