This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/27/2018 at 23:31:28 (UTC).

Underhill vs. Eardish Corporation

Case Summary

On 01/24/2013 Underhill filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Eardish Corporation. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL R. WOHLFEIL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOEL R. WOHLFEIL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

Underhill, Rodney E

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Eardish Corporation; AKA : Eardish Corp

EARDISH CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

Berger, Harvey C

Attorney at POPE BERGER WILLIAMS & REYNOLDS LLP

300 5Th Avenue

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

SANDS, EUGENE P

Attorney at CARTER SANDS & EHRENREICH LLP

2800 28Th St

Santa Monica, CA 90405

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Underhill, Rodney E. Refers to: Eardish Corporation; Eardish Corporation

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Underhill, Rodney E. Refers to: Eardish Corporation

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Application for Order to Serve the Secretary of State

Application for Order to Serve the Secretary of State (Declaration of Harvey C Berger in support of same) filed by Underhill, Rodney E.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (RECORD OF SERVICE OF PROCESS) filed by Underhill, Rodney E.

Certificate of Service

Certificate of Service filed by Underhill, Rodney E. Refers to: Eardish Corporation

Motion to Strike

Motion to Strike (portions of complaint) filed by Eardish Corporation.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Underhill, Rodney E.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 06/28/2013 02:00:00 PM. (Subsequently amended - See ROA # 40)

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for OSC - Sanctions heard 07/26/2013 01:30:00 PM.

Order to Show Cause (Sanctions) SD

Order to Show Cause (Sanctions) SD generated.

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations (Demurrer) filed by Underhill, Rodney E.

Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling filed by Underhill, Rodney E. Refers to: Eardish Corporation

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (Declaration of service) filed by Underhill, Rodney E. Refers to: Eardish Corporation

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by Eardish Corporation. Refers to: Underhill, Rodney

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 02/21/2014 10:45:00 AM.

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2014
  • Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Underhill, Rodney E .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Eardish Corporation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Eardish Corporation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Eardish Corporation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Underhill, Rodney E .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation - Other filed by Underhill, Rodney E; Eardish Corporation. Filed By: Underhill, Rodney E (Cross - Defendant); Eardish Corporation (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 02/21/2014 10:45:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • Civil Jury Trial set for 3/07/2014 at 8:30 am vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Allowing Service on the Secretary of State filed by Underhill, Rodney E. Filed By: Underhill, Rodney E (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Application for Order to Serve the Secretary of State (Declaration of Harvey C Berger in support of same) filed by Underhill, Rodney E. Filed By: Underhill, Rodney E (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Progress: Inability to Serve submitted by Underhill, Rodney E rejected on 03/26/2013. Filed By: Underhill, Rodney E (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Non-Service filed by Underhill, Rodney E. Refers to: Eardish Corporation Filed By: Underhill, Rodney E (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/28/2013 at 02:00:00 PM at Central in C-73 Steven R. Denton.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2013
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Denton, Steven.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Underhill, Rodney E. Refers to: Eardish Corporation Filed By: Underhill, Rodney E (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Underhill, Rodney E. Refers to: Eardish Corporation Filed By: Underhill, Rodney E (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Underhill, Rodney E. Refers to: Eardish Corporation; Eardish Corporation Filed By: Underhill, Rodney E (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EARDISH CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANDS EUGENE P