This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/17/2023 at 07:07:01 (UTC).

Tubbs vs Star of David Enterprises Inc

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 Tubbs filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Star of David Enterprises Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald F. Frazier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald F. Frazier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tubbs, Justin A

Defendants

Hudson Insurance Company

Star of David Enterprises Inc; DBA : Unicars

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sadr, Kasra

1455 Frazee Rd Suite 500

San Diego, CA 92108

Defendant Attorney

Gascou, Christian J.

9696 Culver Boulevard 302

Culver City, CA 90232

 

Court Documents

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Tubbs, Justin A. Refers to: Star of David Enterprises Inc; Hudson Insurance Company

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Tubbs, Justin A. Refers to: Star of David Enterprises Inc; Hudson Insurance Company

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Tubbs, Justin A. Refers to: Star of David Enterprises Inc; Hudson Insurance Company

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Tubbs, Justin A.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Tubbs, Justin A.

Answer

Answer filed by Hudson Insurance Company.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Tubbs, Justin A.; Filed By: Tubbs, Justin A (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Tubbs, Justin A.; Filed By: Tubbs, Justin A (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Hudson Insurance Company.; Filed By: Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/19/2023 at 11:15:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Frazier, Ronald.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Tubbs, Justin A. Refers to: Star of David Enterprises Inc; Hudson Insurance Company; Filed By: Tubbs, Justin A (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Tubbs, Justin A. Refers to: Star of David Enterprises Inc; Hudson Insurance Company; Filed By: Tubbs, Justin A (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Tubbs, Justin A. Refers to: Star of David Enterprises Inc; Hudson Insurance Company; Filed By: Tubbs, Justin A (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNICARS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Hudson Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SADR KASRA