Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/26/2021 at 11:41:03 (UTC).

Trace3 LLC vs Fasack

Case Summary

On 07/23/2020 Trace3 LLC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Fasack. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Joel R. Wohlfeil. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Joel R. Wohlfeil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRACE3 LLC

Defendants

Fasack, Ian

Tomlin, Scott

ENTISYS360

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DELANEY, DAMIEN P

Delaney, Damien

Defendant Attorney

Maschler, Brian P

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by TRACE3 LLC.

Motion for Preliminary Injunction

Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by TRACE3 LLC.

Declaration In Support Of Motion

Declaration - Other (of John Brawn) filed by TRACE3 LLC.

Declaration In Support Of Motion

Declaration - Other (of Danielle Rodriguez) filed by TRACE3 LLC.

DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

Opposition - Other (to plaintiff's ex parte application for order to show cause and TRO) filed by ENTISYS360; Fasack, Ian; Tomlin, Scott.

DECLARATION OF BRAD BUSSIE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

Declaration - Other (of Brad Bussie in support of opposition) filed by ENTISYS360; Fasack, Ian; Tomlin, Scott.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by TRACE3 LLC.

Notice - Other (Notices)

Notice - Other (OF SETTLEMENT) filed by TRACE3 LLC.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/15/2021 01:30:00 PM.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

Defendant Ian Fasack's Answer to Trace3 LLC's Complaint for Damages

Answer filed by Fasack, Ian.

Temporary Restraining Order

Temporary Restraining Order filed by TRACE3 LLC.

Proposed Order

Proposed Order (granting ex parte) submitted by TRACE3 LLC received but not filed on 08/10/2020.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (of Brian M Noh in support of ex parte) filed by TRACE3 LLC.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (of Jack Britton in support of ex parte) filed by TRACE3 LLC.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (ex parte, declarations) filed by TRACE3 LLC.

DECLARATION OF BRIAN P. MASCHLER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

Declaration - Other (of Brian P Maschler in support of opposition) filed by ENTISYS360; Fasack, Ian; Tomlin, Scott.

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL STROHL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

Declaration - Other (of Michael Strohl in support of opposition) filed by ENTISYS360; Fasack, Ian; Tomlin, Scott.

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by TRACE3 LLC. Filed By: TRACE3 LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 11/12/2021 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 10/29/2021 at 10:45:00 AM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Fasack, Ian .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Tomlin, Scott .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to ENTISYS360.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to TRACE3 LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due (and Request for Court to Retain Jurisdiction Following Settlement and Dismissal Per CCP 664.6 and Order) filed by TRACE3 LLC; ENTISYS360; Fasack, Ian; Tomlin, Scott. Filed By: TRACE3 LLC (Plaintiff); ENTISYS360 (Defendant); Fasack, Ian (Defendant); Tomlin, Scott (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 02/08/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/15/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 1]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint filed by TRACE3 LLC. Refers to: Fasack, Ian; Tomlin, Scott; ENTISYS360 Filed By: TRACE3 LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 2]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by TRACE3 LLC. Refers to: Fasack, Ian; Tomlin, Scott; ENTISYS360 Filed By: TRACE3 LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 3]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by TRACE3 LLC. Refers to: Fasack, Ian; Tomlin, Scott; ENTISYS360 Filed By: TRACE3 LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MASCHLER, BRIAN P.