This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/24/2019 at 07:38:12 (UTC).

Top Quality Plumbing, Inc. vs. Howerton Management Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/15/2009 Top Quality Plumbing, Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Howerton Management Services, Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOP QUALITY PLUMBING INC

Defendant

HOWERTON MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 08/28/2009 09:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 08/14/2009 02:30:00 PM.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 08/28/2009 09:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2009
  • DocketJudgment entered.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 08/14/2009 02:30:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2009
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial continued to 08/28/2009 at 09:30 AM before KM-1.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2009
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 08/28/2009 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in KM-1 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2009
  • DocketThe Small Claims Court Trial was rescheduled to 08/28/2009 at 09:30:00 AM in KM-1 before at Central.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2009
  • DocketProof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Substitute filed by Top Quality Plumbing, Inc.. Refers to: Howerton Management Services Inc Filed By: Top Quality Plumbing Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2009
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 08/14/2009 at 02:30:00 PM at Central in KM-1 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2009
  • DocketCase assigned to Department KM-1.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2009
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Top Quality Plumbing, Inc.. Refers to: Howerton Management Services Inc Filed By: Top Quality Plumbing Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less