This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/05/2018 at 17:08:07 (UTC).

Tonini vs. American Brokers Conduit

Case Summary

On 10/25/2013 Tonini filed an Other lawsuit against American Brokers Conduit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TIMOTHY M. CASSERLY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************T-NC

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

TIMOTHY M. CASSERLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

Tonini, Richard

Carlsbad, CA 92009

TONINI, RICHARD B

Carlsbad, CA 92009

Defendants and Respondents

American Brokers Conduit

Recontrust Company, N.A.

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE UNDER THE POOLING AND SERVICING AGREEMENT RELATING TO IMPAC SECURED ASSETS CORP MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2066-5; ESA : DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY;ESA : IMPAC SECURED ASSETS CO

BANK OF AMERICA N A

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY RIGHT TITLE ESTATE LIEN OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFFS TITLE OR ANY CLOUD UPON THE TITLE THERETO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

KENNEY, MARK JOSEPH

Attorney at SEVERSON & WERSON ONE EMBARCADERO CENTER SUITE

1 Embarcadero Center Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94111

WALSER-JOLLY, GENEVIEVE R

Attorney at SEVERSON & WERSON

19100 Von Karman Ave #700

Irvine, CA 92612

CROSS, MICHAEL G

Attorney at One Embarcadero Center Suite

1 Embarcadero Center #2600

San Francisco, CA 94111

CHILTON, JAN T.

Attorney at SEVERSON & WERSON One Embarcadero Center Suite

1 Embarcadero Center Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Tonini, Richard. Refers to: American Brokers Conduit; Recontrust Company, N.A.

Demurrer filed by Recontrust Company, N.A..

Demurrer filed by Recontrust Company, N.A.. Refers to: Tonini, Richard

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/17/2014 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly.

Proof of Service - Certified Mail - Out of State

Proof of Service - Certified Mail - Out of State filed by Tonini, Richard.

Notice of Motion and Supporting Declarations

Notice of Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Recontrust Company, N.A.; DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY; MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC; BANK OF AMERICA N A. Refers to: Tonini, Richard

Notice to Filing Party SD

The default filed by Tonini, Richard B was denied. Refers to: American Brokers Conduit

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Tonini, Richard B. Refers to: American Brokers Conduit

Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations

Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations (06/13/14-DEMURRER TO FAC) filed by Recontrust Company, N.A..

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (KIRA ABERLE) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

Judgment of Dismissal

Judgment of Dismissal filed by Recontrust Company, N.A.; Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee Under the Pooling and Servicing Agreement Relating to IMPAC Secured Assets Corp Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2066-5; MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC; BANK OF AMERICA N A.

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER) filed by Recontrust Company, N.A.; Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee Under the Pooling and Servicing Agreement Relating to IMPAC Secured Assets Corp Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2066-5; MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC; BANK OF AMERICA N A.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Recontrust Company, N.A.; Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee Under the Pooling and Servicing Agreement Relating to IMPAC Secured Assets Corp Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2066-5; MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC; BANK OF AMERICA N A.

Notice of Filing SD

Notice of Appeal filed by Tonini, Richard B. Refers to: Recontrust Company, N.A.; Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee Under the Pooling and Servicing Agreement Relating to IMPAC Secured Assets Corp Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2066-5; MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC; BANK OF AMERICA N A

Order

Order (Court of Appeal Docketing Sheet) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Notice of Designation of Record on Appeal and Election to Proceed by Appendix and Reporter's Transcript

[Another document for ROA# 60]

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Tonini, Richard B.

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Remittitur filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Recontrust Company, N.A. and against Tonini, Richard B for $ 0.00, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 0.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • Notice of Appeal dismissed without prejudice as to Tonini, Richard B .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • Notice of Appeal dismissed without prejudice as to Recontrust Company, N.A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • Notice of Appeal dismissed without prejudice as to MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • Notice of Appeal dismissed without prejudice as to Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee Under the Pooling and Servicing Agreement Relating to IMPAC Secured Assets Corp Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2066-5.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • Notice of Appeal dismissed without prejudice as to BANK OF AMERICA N A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order (Court of Appeal order) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt for Record on Appeal filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Completion of the Record on Appeal SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2014
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Demurrer filed by Recontrust Company, N.A.. Refers to: Tonini, Richard Filed By: Recontrust Company, N.A. (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • Demurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 01/24/2014 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-26 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2013
  • Hearing on Petition scheduled for 01/24/2014 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-26 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2013
  • Case assigned to Department N-26.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Verified Statement of Factual Accusations) filed by Tonini, Richard. Refers to: American Brokers Conduit; Recontrust Company, N.A. Filed By: Tonini, Richard B (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Verified Judicial Notice of Statement of Facts) filed by Tonini, Richard. Refers to: American Brokers Conduit; Recontrust Company, N.A. Filed By: Tonini, Richard B (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Tonini, Richard. Refers to: American Brokers Conduit; Recontrust Company, N.A. Filed By: Tonini, Richard B (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition - Other (Verified Petition for Declaratory Judgment) filed by Tonini, Richard. Refers to: American Brokers Conduit; Recontrust Company, N.A.; Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee Under the Pooling and Servicing Agreement Relating to IMPAC Secured Assets Corp Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2066-5; MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC; BANK OF AMERICA N A Filed By: Tonini, Richard B (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.