This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/17/2016 at 06:44:15 (UTC).

Tommy Reyes Vs. The Valladolid Corporation

Case Summary

On 06/11/2010 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Tommy Reyes against The Valladolid Corporation in the jurisdiction of San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2010

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Reyes, Tommy

Defendants

The Valladolid Corporation; Dba : Tvc Financial

Valladolid, Guillermo

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 09/10/2010 09:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion to Vacate Judgment heard 09/26/2011 10:00:00 AM.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized. (As Amended)

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion to Vacate Judgment heard 07/11/2011 10:00:00 AM.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized. (Subsequently amended - See ROA # 26)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) SD

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) SD generated.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from C-22 to C-62 effective 01/12/2018.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 09/10/2010 09:30:00 AM.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2018
  • Case reassigned from C-62 to C-63 effective 04/14/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case reassigned from C-22 to C-62 effective 01/12/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2014
  • Case reassigned from KM-1 to C-22 effective 12/21/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized. (As Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2011
  • The Court finds judgment on the Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court for Tommy Reyes and against The Valladolid Corporation, DBA TVC Financial in the amount of: $5790.00 principal, $85.00 costs, $0 pre-judgment interest. Defendant Guillermo aka William Valladolid owes nothing on Plaintiff's Claim as set forth in the minute order of the Court, 10/3/2011, a certified copy of which is attached hereto and made a part of this notice by reference.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized. (Subsequently amended - See ROA # 26)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Motion to Vacate Judgment heard 09/26/2011 10:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2011
  • Judgment entered against The Valladolid Corporation, DBA TVC Financial, Guillermo Valladolid on the Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2011
  • Motion to Vacate filed by Valladolid, Guillermo. Refers to: Reyes, Tommy Filed By: Valladolid, Guillermo (Defendant); The Valladolid Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2010
  • Abstract of Judgment issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 09/10/2010 09:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 09/10/2010 09:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2010
  • Judgment entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2010
  • Small Claims Court Trial scheduled for 09/10/2010 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in KM-1 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2010
  • The Small Claims Court Trial was rescheduled to 09/10/2010 at 09:30:00 AM in KM-1 before at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2010
  • Small Claims Court Trial scheduled for 08/03/2010 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in KM-1 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2010
  • Case assigned to Department KM-1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2010
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Reyes, Tommy. Refers to: The Valladolid Corporation; Valladolid, Guillermo Filed By: Reyes, Tommy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.