This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/24/2018 at 00:53:09 (UTC).

Toma vs. County of San Diego

Case Summary

On 04/11/2012 Toma filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against County of San Diego. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDDIE C STURGEON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-EC

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

EDDIE C STURGEON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Toma, Janan Tobia

Defendants and Cross Defendants

County of San Diego

Ham, Jeanette

Ham, Kevin

Kevin Ham and Jeanette Ham as Trustees of the Ham Revocable Trust dated August 1 2003

The Ham Revocable Trust dated August 1 2003

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Ham, Jeanette

Ham, Kevin

Kevin Ham and Jeanette Ham as Trustees of the Ham Revocable Trust dated August 1 2003

The Ham Revocable Trust dated August 1 2003

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

De Santis, Frank

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF FRANK DE SANTIS

298 3Rd Ave

Chula Vista, CA 91910

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

BREWSTER, GEORGE W JR

CANNON, PAUL B

POPENEY, ROGER L

Attorney at HARTSUYKER STRATMAN & WILLIAMS ABREGO

P O Box 258829

Oklahoma City, OK 73125

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

CANNON, PAUL B

POPENEY, ROGER L

Attorney at HARTSUYKER STRATMAN & WILLIAMS ABREGO

P O Box 258829

Oklahoma City, OK 73125

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Toma, Janan Tobia. Refers to: County of San Diego; The Ham Revocable Trust dated August 1 2003; Ham, Kevin; Ham, Jeanette; Kevin Ham and Jeanette Ham as Trustees of the Ham Revocable Trust dated August 1 2003

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Toma, Janan Tobia. Refers to: County of San Diego

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by County of San Diego.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Toma, Janan Tobia. Refers to: The Ham Revocable Trust dated August 1 2003

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (CROSS-COMPLAINT) filed by County of San Diego. Refers to: Kevin Ham and Jeanette Ham as Trustees of the Ham Revocable Trust dated August 1 2003

Certificate of Service

Certificate of Service filed by Toma, Janan Tobia.

Answer

Answer filed by The Ham Revocable Trust dated August 1 2003; Ham, Kevin; Ham, Jeanette; Kevin Ham and Jeanette Ham as Trustees of the Ham Revocable Trust dated August 1 2003. Refers to: Toma, Janan

Answer

Answer (To Cross-Complaint filed by County San Diego) filed by The Ham Revocable Trust dated August 1 2003; Ham, Kevin; Ham, Jeanette; Kevin Ham and Jeanette Ham as Trustees of the Ham Revocable Trust dated August 1 2003. Refers to: County of San Diego

Notice of Change in Handling Attorney

Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed by The Ham Revocable Trust dated August 1 2003; Ham, Kevin; Ham, Jeanette; Kevin Ham and Jeanette Ham as Trustees of the Ham Revocable Trust dated August 1 2003.

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (Notice of Case Reassignment) filed by County of San Diego.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Request for Dismissal submitted by Toma, Janan Tobia rejected on 03/05/2013.

Notice to Filing Party SD

[Another document for ROA# 48]

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY COUNTY OF SAN DIEGO ON MAY 24, 2012; Proof of Service By Mail) filed by County of San Diego.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by Toma, Janan Tobia. Refers to: County of San Diego

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 07/19/2013 10:00:00 AM.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY THE HAM REVOCABLE TRUST, ET. AL ON JUNE 25, 2013) submitted by Kevin Ham and Jeanette Ham as Trustees of the Ham Revocable Trust dated August 1 2003 received but not filed on 07/19/2013.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed by Toma, Janan Tobia.

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2013
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Kevin Ham and Jeanette Ham as Trustees of the Ham Revocable Trust dated August 1 2003.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2013
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Ham, Jeanette .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2013
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Ham, Kevin .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2013
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to The Ham Revocable Trust dated August 1 2003.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2013
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to County of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Toma, Janan Tobia .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to The Ham Revocable Trust dated August 1 2003.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Kevin Ham and Jeanette Ham as Trustees of the Ham Revocable Trust dated August 1 2003.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Ham, Kevin .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Ham, Jeanette .

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by County of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Cross-Complaint filed by County of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by County of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Toma, Janan Tobia. Refers to: County of San Diego Filed By: Toma, Janan Tobia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Toma, Janan Tobia. Refers to: County of San Diego; The Ham Revocable Trust dated August 1 2003; Ham, Kevin; Ham, Jeanette; Kevin Ham and Jeanette Ham as Trustees of the Ham Revocable Trust dated August 1 2003 Filed By: Toma, Janan Tobia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Toma, Janan Tobia. Refers to: County of San Diego; The Ham Revocable Trust dated August 1 2003; Ham, Kevin; Ham, Jeanette; Kevin Ham and Jeanette Ham as Trustees of the Ham Revocable Trust dated August 1 2003 Filed By: Toma, Janan Tobia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Toma, Janan Tobia. Refers to: County of San Diego; The Ham Revocable Trust dated August 1 2003; Ham, Kevin; Ham, Jeanette; Kevin Ham and Jeanette Ham as Trustees of the Ham Revocable Trust dated August 1 2003 Filed By: Toma, Janan Tobia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less