This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/23/2018 at 14:34:50 (UTC).

Toma vs. AGKSOFT

Case Summary

On 02/22/2012 Toma filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AGKSOFT. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDDIE C STURGEON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Satisfied.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-EC

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Satisfied

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

EDDIE C STURGEON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Toma, Hani

Defendants

AGKSOFT

Karam, Antoine G; DBA : AGKSOFT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rankin, David S

359 W Madison Ave

El Cajon, CA 92020

Defendant Attorney

CIRLIN, JASON N

Attorney at WOOLF GAFNI & FLOWLER LLP

10850 Wilshire Boulevard 510

Los Angeles, CA 90024

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Toma, Hani. Refers to: AGKSOFT; Karam, Antoine

Notice of Hearing SD

OSC - Failure to File Certificate of Service scheduled for 06/08/2012 at 11:00:00 AM at East County in E-15 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (Of Filing of Affidavits of Constable) filed by Toma, Hani.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/03/2012 at 10:30:00 AM at East County in E-15 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Toma, Hani.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by AGKSOFT; Karam, Antoine G.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/03/2012 10:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (NOTICE TO ATTEND TRIAL IN LIEU OF SUBPOENA; Proof of Service) filed by AGKSOFT; Karam, Antoine G.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 05/24/2013 10:00:00 AM.

Joint Trial Readiness Conference Report

Joint Trial Readiness Conference Report filed by AGKSOFT; Toma, Hani.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 07/12/2013 10:00:00 AM.

Advance Trial Review Order

Advance Trial Review Order filed by Toma, Hani; AGKSOFT.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Request for Dismissal of Does

Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Toma, Hani.

Stipulation for Entry of Judgment

Stipulation for Entry of Judgment filed by Toma, Hani. Refers to: AGKSOFT; Karam, Antoine

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Toma, Hani.

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed by Toma, Hani. Refers to: AGKSOFT; Karam, Antoine Filed By: Toma, Hani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by Mail filed by Toma, Hani. Filed By: Toma, Hani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed by Toma, Hani. Refers to: AGKSOFT; Karam, Antoine Filed By: Toma, Hani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2013
  • Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Toma, Hani and against AGKSOFT;Karam, Antoine G for $ 8000.00, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 0.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 8000.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment filed by Toma, Hani. Refers to: AGKSOFT; Karam, Antoine Filed By: Toma, Hani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation for Entry of Judgment filed by Toma, Hani. Refers to: AGKSOFT; Karam, Antoine Filed By: Toma, Hani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Toma, Hani. Filed By: Toma, Hani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2013
  • Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 08/16/2013 at 09:00:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2012
  • OSC - Failure to File Certificate of Service scheduled for 06/08/2012 at 11:00:00 AM at East County in E-15 Joel R. Wohlfeil was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Service filed by Toma, Hani. Refers to: AGKSOFT; Karam, Antoine Filed By: Toma, Hani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (Of Filing of Affidavits of Constable) filed by Toma, Hani. Filed By: Toma, Hani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • OSC - Failure to File Certificate of Service scheduled for 06/08/2012 at 11:00:00 AM at East County in E-15 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Toma, Hani. Refers to: AGKSOFT; Karam, Antoine Filed By: Toma, Hani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Toma, Hani. Refers to: AGKSOFT; Karam, Antoine Filed By: Toma, Hani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Toma, Hani. Refers to: AGKSOFT; Karam, Antoine Filed By: Toma, Hani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less