This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/16/2018 at 20:59:25 (UTC).

Tom Hicke vs California Services Bureau Inc

Case Summary

On 04/26/2017 Tom Hicke filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against California Services Bureau Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY W POLLACK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

GREGORY W POLLACK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HICKE, TOM

Defendant

CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDMAN, TODD M

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF TODD FRIEDMAN P C

21550 Oxnard Street 780

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

 

Court Documents

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint (First) filed by Hicke, Tom. Refers to: Collecto Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Hicke, Tom. Refers to: Collecto Inc

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Hicke, Tom.

Notice of Motion for Leave to Amend

Motion for Leave to Amend filed by Hicke, Tom.

in support of Motion for Leave to File A Second Amended Complaint

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of Motion for Leave to File A Second Amended Complaint) filed by Hicke, Tom.

of Todd M Friedman in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend

Declaration - Other (of Todd M Friedman in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend) filed by Hicke, Tom.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 16]

of Todd M Friedman in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend

[Another document for ROA# 16]

in support of Motion for Leave to File A Second Amended Complaint

[Another document for ROA# 16]

Notice of Motion for Leave to Amend

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Collecto Inc.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Collecto Inc.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/29/2017 01:30:00 PM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint (2nd) filed by Hicke, Tom. Refers to: California Business Bureau Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons (on 2nd Amended Complaint) filed by Hicke, Tom. Refers to: California Business Bureau Inc

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Hicke, Tom.

Notice of Unconditional Settlement

Notice of Unconditional Settlement filed by Hicke, Tom.

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Hicke, Tom .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to California Business Bureau Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Hicke, Tom. Filed By: Hicke, Tom (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Unconditional Settlement filed by Hicke, Tom. Filed By: Hicke, Tom (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/01/2017 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Hicke, Tom. Filed By: Hicke, Tom (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons (on 2nd Amended Complaint) filed by Hicke, Tom. Refers to: California Business Bureau Inc Filed By: Hicke, Tom (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint (2nd) filed by Hicke, Tom. Refers to: California Business Bureau Inc Filed By: Hicke, Tom (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/29/2017 01:30:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2017
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Hicke, Tom. Refers to: Collecto Inc Filed By: Hicke, Tom (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint (First) filed by Hicke, Tom. Refers to: Collecto Inc Filed By: Hicke, Tom (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/29/2017 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Hicke, Tom. Refers to: California Services Bureau Inc Filed By: Hicke, Tom (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hicke, Tom. Refers to: California Services Bureau Inc Filed By: Hicke, Tom (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Hicke, Tom. Refers to: California Services Bureau Inc Filed By: Hicke, Tom (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRIEDMAN TODD M.