This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 07/14/2018 at 01:31:08 (UTC).

Timothy Ewing vs Insurance Company of the West

Case Summary

On 05/24/2017 Timothy Ewing filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Insurance Company of the West. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JUDITH F. HAYES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JUDITH F. HAYES

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EWING, JANICE

EWING, TIMOTHY

Defendant

INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TROPEA, SANTINO

2851 Camino Del Rio S #410

San Diego, CA 92108

CAUFIELD, JEFFREY

2851 Camino Del Rio S Ste 410

San Diego, CA 92108

Defendant Attorneys

LAMBERT, JODI E

5030 Camino De La Siesta #106

San Diego, CA 92108

HOLLINS, ANDREW S

Attorney at PAKER IBRAHIM & BERG LLC

695 Town Center Drive 16Th Floor

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 06/01/2018 10:30:00 AM.

Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint

Reply filed by Ewing, Janice; Ewing, Timothy.

Response

Response (Response to Ex Parte Application) filed by Insurance Company of the West.

Declaration Lindsey A Forrester

Declaration - Other (Declaration Lindsey A Forrester) filed by Ewing, Janice; Ewing, Timothy.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Ewing, Janice; Ewing, Timothy.

Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment

Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication filed by Insurance Company of the West; Insurance Company of the West.

Declaration of Robert V. Closson in Support thereof

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Robert V. Closson in Support thereof) filed by Insurance Company of the West; Insurance Company of the West.

Declaration of David Reilly in Support thereof

Declaration - Other (Declaration of David Reilly in Support thereof) filed by Insurance Company of the West; Insurance Company of the West.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Insurance Company of the West; Insurance Company of the West.

Exhibits in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment

Exhibit List (Exhibits in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment) filed by Insurance Company of the West; Insurance Company of the West.

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Insurance Company of the West.

Opposition to ICW's Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts re: MSJ/MSA

Opposition - Other (Opposition to ICW's Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts re: MSJ/MSA) filed by Ewing, Janice; Ewing, Timothy.

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Johnell Gallivan - CSR# 10505) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) heard 01/12/2018 10:30:00 AM.

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY RE: PENDING MSJ) filed by Insurance Company of the West.

Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint

Motion for Leave to Amend (Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint) filed by Ewing, Janice; Ewing, Timothy.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Ewing, Janice; Ewing, Timothy.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Ewing, Janice; Ewing, Timothy. Refers to: Insurance Company of the West Filed By: Ewing, Janice (Plaintiff); Ewing, Timothy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 06/01/2018 10:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 03/01/2019 at 09:00AM before Judge Judith F. Hayes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 02/15/2019 at 09:15AM before Judge Judith F. Hayes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • Jury demanded by all parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • Pursuant to California Rules of Court 3.714, the Court, after having met and conferred with counsel, categorizes this case as one that will be disposed of within 24 months.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Reply filed by Ewing, Janice; Ewing, Timothy. Filed By: Ewing, Janice (Plaintiff); Ewing, Timothy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations (MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FAC) filed by Insurance Company of the West. Filed By: Insurance Company of the West (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 07/06/2018 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Judith F. Hayes was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Ewing, Janice; Ewing, Janice; Ewing, Timothy; Ewing, Timothy. Filed By: Ewing, Janice (Plaintiff); Ewing, Janice (Plaintiff); Ewing, Timothy (Plaintiff); Ewing, Timothy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Errata filed by Ewing, Janice; Ewing, Janice; Ewing, Timothy; Ewing, Timothy. Filed By: Ewing, Janice (Plaintiff); Ewing, Janice (Plaintiff); Ewing, Timothy (Plaintiff); Ewing, Timothy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/15/2017 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-68 Judith F. Hayes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Hayes, Judith.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Ewing, Timothy; Ewing, Janice. Refers to: Insurance Company of the West Filed By: Ewing, Timothy (Plaintiff); Ewing, Janice (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ewing, Timothy; Ewing, Janice. Refers to: Insurance Company of the West Filed By: Ewing, Timothy (Plaintiff); Ewing, Janice (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Ewing, Timothy; Ewing, Janice. Refers to: Insurance Company of the West Filed By: Ewing, Timothy (Plaintiff); Ewing, Janice (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Caufield, Jeffery Laun