This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/25/2021 at 06:11:34 (UTC).

Thompson vs Rust & Sons Trucking Inc

Case Summary

On 06/22/2020 Thompson filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Rust Sons Trucking Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Joel R. Wohlfeil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Joel R. Wohlfeil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thompson, Gene

Defendant

Rust & Sons Trucking Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lurtz, Marshall

Attorney at LURTZ LEGAL

3511 Camino Del Rio South 101

San Diego, CA 92108

Defendant Attorney

Graves, David William

Attorney at LATURNO & GRAVES

822 Strawberry Glen

Escondido, CA 92025

 

Court Documents

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Thompson, Gene. Refers to: Rust & Sons Trucking Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Thompson, Gene. Refers to: Rust & Sons Trucking Inc

Complaint

Complaint filed by Thompson, Gene. Refers to: Rust & Sons Trucking Inc

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Rust & Sons Trucking Inc.

Answer

Answer filed by Rust & Sons Trucking Inc.

Joint Stipulation Continuing Trial Date and Trial Related Dates; [Proposed] Order

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (to Continue Trial and Related Dates, Order signed 10/5/21) filed by Thompson, Gene; Rust & Sons Trucking Inc.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 06/03/2022 at 10:45:00 AM in C-73 before Joel R. Wohlfeil at Central.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Jury Trial was rescheduled to 06/17/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in C-73 before Joel R. Wohlfeil at Central.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 03/12/2021 01:30:00 PM.

Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Thompson, Gene.

Plaintiff's Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Thompson, Gene.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Rust & Sons Trucking Inc.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Rust & Sons Trucking Inc.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Civil Jury Trial was rescheduled to 06/17/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in C-73 before Joel R. Wohlfeil at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 06/17/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 06/03/2022 at 10:45:00 AM in C-73 before Joel R. Wohlfeil at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2021
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 06/03/2022 at 10:45:00 AM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due (to Continue Trial and Related Dates, Order signed 10/5/21) filed by Thompson, Gene; Rust & Sons Trucking Inc. Filed By: Thompson, Gene (Plaintiff); Rust & Sons Trucking Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketPursuant to California Rules of Court 3.714, the Court, after having met and conferred with counsel, categorizes this case as one that will be disposed of within 24 months.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 01/14/2022 at 08:30AM before Judge Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 12/16/2021 at 10:45AM before Judge Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Thompson, Gene. Filed By: Thompson, Gene (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Rust & Sons Trucking Inc. Filed By: Rust & Sons Trucking Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Rust & Sons Trucking Inc. Filed By: Rust & Sons Trucking Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/12/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Thompson, Gene. Refers to: Rust & Sons Trucking Inc Filed By: Thompson, Gene (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Thompson, Gene. Refers to: Rust & Sons Trucking Inc Filed By: Thompson, Gene (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Thompson, Gene. Refers to: Rust & Sons Trucking Inc Filed By: Thompson, Gene (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RUST & SONS TRUCKING INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LURTZ MARSHALL R.