This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 10/25/2022 at 08:04:19 (UTC).

Thompson vs G I Trucking Company

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 Thompson filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against G I Trucking Company. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Bacal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Katherine Bacal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thompson, Demayne

Defendant

G I Trucking Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Campbell, Jessica L

Defendant Attorney

Jensen, Garrett V

 

Court Documents

Complaint (Case Initiation)

Complaint filed by Thompson, Demayne. Refers to: G I Trucking Company

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Thompson, Demayne. Refers to: G I Trucking Company

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by Thompson, Demayne. Refers to: G I Trucking Company

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Personal Service - Petition (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Thompson, Demayne. Refers to: G I Trucking Company

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by G I Trucking Company.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-69; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by G I Trucking Company.; Filed By: G I Trucking Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Thompson, Demayne. Refers to: G I Trucking Company; Filed By: Thompson, Demayne (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/06/2023 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bacal, Katherine.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Thompson, Demayne. Refers to: G I Trucking Company; Filed By: Thompson, Demayne (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Thompson, Demayne. Refers to: G I Trucking Company; Filed By: Thompson, Demayne (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Thompson, Demayne. Refers to: G I Trucking Company; Filed By: Thompson, Demayne (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less