This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/28/2021 at 04:31:31 (UTC).

Thompson vs Amparo

Case Summary

On 08/25/2020 Thompson filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Amparo. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard S. Whitney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Richard S. Whitney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Thompson, Kerrie

Thompson, James

Defendants

AMPARO, MARK

Gocryo Inc

Nextgen Cryo Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ORLAND, JAMES J

Attorney at ORLAND LAW GROUP

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint as to Nextgen Cryo, Inc.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Thompson, James; Thompson, Kerrie. Refers to: Nextgen Cryo Inc

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint as to Mark Amparo

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Thompson, James; Thompson, Kerrie. Refers to: AMPARO, MARK

Proof of Service by Mail as to Nextgen Cryo, Inc.

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Thompson, James; Thompson, Kerrie.

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint as to Gocryo, Inc..

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Thompson, James; Thompson, Kerrie. Refers to: Gocryo Inc

Answer

Answer filed by Gocryo Inc; AMPARO, MARK; Nextgen Cryo Inc. Refers to: Thompson, James; Thompson, Kerrie

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Gocryo Inc; AMPARO, MARK; Nextgen Cryo Inc.

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Thompson, James.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Thompson, James; Thompson, Kerrie. Refers to: AMPARO, MARK; Nextgen Cryo Inc; Gocryo Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Thompson, James; Thompson, Kerrie. Refers to: AMPARO, MARK; Nextgen Cryo Inc; Gocryo Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Thompson, James; Thompson, Kerrie. Refers to: AMPARO, MARK; Nextgen Cryo Inc; Gocryo Inc

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-68; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Gocryo Inc; AMPARO, MARK; Nextgen Cryo Inc. Refers to: Thompson, James; Thompson, Kerrie Filed By: Gocryo Inc (Defendant); AMPARO, MARK (Defendant); Nextgen Cryo Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Gocryo Inc; AMPARO, MARK; Nextgen Cryo Inc. Filed By: Gocryo Inc (Defendant); AMPARO, MARK (Defendant); Nextgen Cryo Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Thompson, James; Thompson, Kerrie. Refers to: Nextgen Cryo Inc Filed By: Thompson, James (Plaintiff); Thompson, Kerrie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Thompson, James; Thompson, Kerrie. Refers to: AMPARO, MARK Filed By: Thompson, James (Plaintiff); Thompson, Kerrie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail filed by Thompson, James; Thompson, Kerrie. Filed By: Thompson, James (Plaintiff); Thompson, Kerrie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Thompson, James; Thompson, Kerrie. Refers to: Gocryo Inc Filed By: Thompson, James (Plaintiff); Thompson, Kerrie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Thompson, James. Filed By: Thompson, James (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/11/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Thompson, James; Thompson, Kerrie. Refers to: AMPARO, MARK; Nextgen Cryo Inc; Gocryo Inc Filed By: Thompson, James (Plaintiff); Thompson, Kerrie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Thompson, James; Thompson, Kerrie. Refers to: AMPARO, MARK; Nextgen Cryo Inc; Gocryo Inc Filed By: Thompson, James (Plaintiff); Thompson, Kerrie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Thompson, James; Thompson, Kerrie. Refers to: AMPARO, MARK; Nextgen Cryo Inc; Gocryo Inc Filed By: Thompson, James (Plaintiff); Thompson, Kerrie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Whitney, Richard.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ORLAND JAMES J.