This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/07/2021 at 05:18:44 (UTC).

Thomas vs Vallarta Food Enterprises Inc

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 Thomas filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Vallarta Food Enterprises Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Carolyn Caietti. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Carolyn Caietti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas, Darlene

Defendant

Vallarta Food Enterprises Inc; DBA : Vallarta Supermarkets

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Glick, Noam

225 Broadway 19Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

Dwin, Evan

2121 Palomar Airport Road Suite 160

Carlsbad, CA 92011

Markley, Shaun A

225 Broadway 19Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

Nicholas, Craig M

Attorney at NICHOLAS & TOMASEVIC LLP

225 Broadway 19Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

Carlon, Joshua D

633 W 5Th St #4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Original Summons

[A document for ROA# 3]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Thomas, Darlene. Refers to: Vallarta Food Enterprises Inc

Class Action Complaint

[A document for ROA# 1]

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Thomas, Darlene. Refers to: Vallarta Food Enterprises Inc

First Amended Class Action Complaint

Amended Complaint (First) filed by Thomas, Darlene. Refers to: Vallarta Food Enterprises Inc

Notice of Case Transmittal and Notice of Receipt of Transferred Case SD

Case file contents transferred to receiving court SAN BERNARDINO pursuant to court order.

Notice of Signing of an Order RE Change of Venue and Request for Payment of Fees SD

Notice of Signing of an Order RE Change of Venue and Request for Payment of Fees SD generated.

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Requests)

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (to Transfer Venue to San Bernardino Superior Court) filed by Vallarta Food Enterprises Inc; Thomas, Darlene.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase file contents transferred to receiving court SAN BERNARDINO pursuant to court order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/18/2022 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-70 Carolyn Caietti was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Signing of an Order RE Change of Venue and Request for Payment of Fees SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due (to Transfer Venue to San Bernardino Superior Court) filed by Vallarta Food Enterprises Inc; Thomas, Darlene. Filed By: Vallarta Food Enterprises Inc (Defendant); Thomas, Darlene (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint (First) filed by Thomas, Darlene. Refers to: Vallarta Food Enterprises Inc Filed By: Thomas, Darlene (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Thomas, Darlene. Refers to: Vallarta Food Enterprises Inc Filed By: Thomas, Darlene (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/18/2022 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-70 Carolyn Caietti.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Thomas, Darlene. Refers to: Vallarta Food Enterprises Inc Filed By: Thomas, Darlene (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Thomas, Darlene. Refers to: Vallarta Food Enterprises Inc Filed By: Thomas, Darlene (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Thomas, Darlene. Refers to: Vallarta Food Enterprises Inc Filed By: Thomas, Darlene (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Caietti, Carolyn.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VALLARTA SUPERMARKETS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARLON JOSHUA DAVID