Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/31/2021 at 10:54:46 (UTC).

Thomas Mark Green vs. Priscilla Martinez

Case Summary

On 10/05/2020 Thomas Mark Green filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Priscilla Martinez. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************R-SC

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Green, Thomas Mark

Respondent

Martinez, Priscilla

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

DiRe, Daniel M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2021
  • HearingLocation: S-15; Event Type: Hearing on Restraining Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney filed by Martinez, Priscilla. Filed By: Martinez, Priscilla (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney submitted by Martinez, Priscilla rejected on 02/03/2021. Filed By: Martinez, Priscilla (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketPetitioner's request to continue the Hearing on Restraining Order and reissue the temporary orders was granted. The Hearing on Restraining Order was continued to 08/12/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department S-15.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 11/16/2020 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Green, Thomas Mark. Refers to: Martinez, Priscilla Filed By: Green, Thomas Mark (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order filed by Green, Thomas Mark. Refers to: Martinez, Priscilla Filed By: Green, Thomas Mark (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (TRO) filed by Green, Thomas Mark. Refers to: Martinez, Priscilla Filed By: Green, Thomas Mark (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketResponse to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by Martinez, Priscilla. Refers to: Green, Thomas Filed By: Martinez, Priscilla (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Response By Mail filed by Martinez, Priscilla. Refers to: Green, Thomas Filed By: Martinez, Priscilla (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (Signed by Paulo Guillinta, MD) filed by Green, Thomas Mark.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (Signed by Noreen Newmark , MD) filed by Green, Thomas Mark.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Green, Thomas Mark. Refers to: Martinez, Priscilla Filed By: Green, Thomas Mark (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Green, Thomas Mark. Refers to: Martinez, Priscilla Filed By: Green, Thomas Mark (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Green, Thomas Mark. Refers to: Martinez, Priscilla Filed By: Green, Thomas Mark (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing filed by Green, Thomas Mark. Refers to: Martinez, Priscilla Filed By: Green, Thomas Mark (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department S-09.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 11/16/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at South County in S-09 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order filed by Green, Thomas Mark. Refers to: Martinez, Priscilla Filed By: Green, Thomas Mark (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DiRe, Daniel M