This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/23/2020 at 00:42:35 (UTC).

Thiel vs Ashford University LLC

Case Summary

On 02/14/2019 Thiel filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Ashford University LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory W Pollack. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory W Pollack

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thiel, Rachel

Defendants

Ashford University LLC

Bridgepoint Education Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Taylor, Christopher W

Attorney at TAYLOR LABOR LAW PC

80 S Lake Avenue 550

Pasadena, CA 91101

Defendant Attorney

McDonough, Sandra L

Attorney at PAUL PLEVIN SULLIVAN & CONNAUGHTON LLP

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Thiel, Rachel.

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Betty J. Ashe, CSR#4844 (619-559-1228)) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 08/30/2019 09:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Thiel, Rachel.

Reply ISO Defendants' Petition to Compel Arbitration

Reply filed by Ashford University LLC; Bridgepoint Education Inc.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 07/19/2019 01:30:00 PM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 07/19/2019 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Thiel, Rachel.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Thiel, Rachel.

Points and Authorities in Support of Petition to Compel Arbiatration

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Ashford University LLC; Bridgepoint Education Inc.

Declaration of Sandra McDonough in Support of Petition to Compel Arbitration

Declaration - Other (of Sandra McDonough) filed by Ashford University LLC; Bridgepoint Education Inc.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Thiel, Rachel. Refers to: Ashford University LLC; Bridgepoint Education Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Thiel, Rachel. Refers to: Ashford University LLC; Bridgepoint Education Inc

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Thiel, Rachel. Filed By: Thiel, Rachel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketMinute Order generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Betty J. Ashe, CSR#4844 (619-559-1228)) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketStatus Conference (Civil) scheduled for 02/21/2020 at 01:30PM before Judge Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 08/30/2019 09:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketTentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 08/30/2019 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Thiel, Rachel. Filed By: Thiel, Rachel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Thiel, Rachel. Filed By: Thiel, Rachel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/19/2019 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Thiel, Rachel. Refers to: Ashford University LLC; Bridgepoint Education Inc Filed By: Thiel, Rachel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Thiel, Rachel. Refers to: Ashford University LLC; Bridgepoint Education Inc Filed By: Thiel, Rachel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Thiel, Rachel. Refers to: Ashford University LLC; Bridgepoint Education Inc Filed By: Thiel, Rachel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ashford University, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Zovio Inc; FKA : Bridgepoint Education Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAYLOR CHRISTOPHER WREN