This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/11/2023 at 11:19:42 (UTC).

THEATRE BOX-SAN DIEGO LLC vs FIREMANS FUND INSURANCE CO

Case Summary

On 05/17/2022 THEATRE BOX-SAN DIEGO LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FIREMANS FUND INSURANCE CO. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew C. Braner. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Matthew C. Braner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THEATRE BOX-SAN DIEGO LLC

Defendant

FIREMANS FUND INSURANCE CO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STILLMAN, PHILIP H

Attorney at STILLMAN & ASSOCIATES

3014 N Bay Rd B

Miami Beach, FL 33140

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by THEATRE BOX-SAN DIEGO LLC. Refers to: FIREMANS FUND INSURANCE CO

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by THEATRE BOX-SAN DIEGO LLC. Refers to: FIREMANS FUND INSURANCE CO

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Complaint

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by THEATRE BOX-SAN DIEGO LLC.

Proof Of Personal Service

Proof of Service filed by THEATRE BOX-SAN DIEGO LLC.

Defendant Firemans Fund Insurance Companys Notice of Filing Notice of Removal of State Court Action to to Federal Court - Exhibit A - Certificate of Service

Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by FIREMANS FUND INSURANCE CO.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/18/2022 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in C-60 Matthew C. Braner was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court filed by FIREMANS FUND INSURANCE CO.; Filed By: FIREMANS FUND INSURANCE CO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by THEATRE BOX-SAN DIEGO LLC.; Filed By: THEATRE BOX-SAN DIEGO LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by THEATRE BOX-SAN DIEGO LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/18/2022 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in C-60 Matthew C. Braner.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Braner, Matthew.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by THEATRE BOX-SAN DIEGO LLC. Refers to: FIREMANS FUND INSURANCE CO; Filed By: THEATRE BOX-SAN DIEGO LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by THEATRE BOX-SAN DIEGO LLC. Refers to: FIREMANS FUND INSURANCE CO; Filed By: THEATRE BOX-SAN DIEGO LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less