This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/24/2023 at 08:01:31 (UTC).

The Richard J Scuba Family Trust Linda Leong Trustee vs Wells Fargo Bank NA

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 The Richard J Scuba Family Trust Linda Leong Trustee filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Wells Fargo Bank NA. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Joel R. Wohlfeil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Joel R. Wohlfeil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Richard J Scuba Family Trust Linda Leong Trustee

Defendants

Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss

Wells Fargo Bank NA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Szymanski, Aniela

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by The Richard J Scuba Family Trust Linda Leong Trustee. Refers to: Wells Fargo Bank NA; Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by The Richard J Scuba Family Trust Linda Leong Trustee. Refers to: Wells Fargo Bank NA; Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by The Richard J Scuba Family Trust Linda Leong Trustee.

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by The Richard J Scuba Family Trust Linda Leong Trustee.

OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

Notice - Other (OF PENDENCY OF ACTION) filed by The Richard J Scuba Family Trust Linda Leong Trustee.

Declaration of Non-Monetary Status

Declaration of Non-Monetary Status filed by Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss.

Notice of Filing of Declaration of Non-Monetary Status

Notice - Other filed by Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by The Richard J Scuba Family Trust Linda Leong Trustee. Refers to: Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss

Motion to Dismiss

Request for Dismissal (no entered) filed by The Richard J Scuba Family Trust Linda Leong Trustee.

Amended Dismissal

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (NOT ENTERED) filed by The Richard J Scuba Family Trust Linda Leong Trustee.

Tentative Rulings

Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 05/12/2023 09:00:00 AM.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/04/2023 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 05/12/2023 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (NOT ENTERED) filed by The Richard J Scuba Family Trust Linda Leong Trustee.; Filed By: The Richard J Scuba Family Trust Linda Leong Trustee (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (no entered) filed by The Richard J Scuba Family Trust Linda Leong Trustee.; Filed By: The Richard J Scuba Family Trust Linda Leong Trustee (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other filed by Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss.; Filed By: Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Monetary Status filed by Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss.; Filed By: Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (OF PENDENCY OF ACTION) filed by The Richard J Scuba Family Trust Linda Leong Trustee.; Filed By: The Richard J Scuba Family Trust Linda Leong Trustee (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by The Richard J Scuba Family Trust Linda Leong Trustee.; Filed By: The Richard J Scuba Family Trust Linda Leong Trustee (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 05/12/2023 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by The Richard J Scuba Family Trust Linda Leong Trustee. Refers to: Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss; Filed By: The Richard J Scuba Family Trust Linda Leong Trustee (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by The Richard J Scuba Family Trust Linda Leong Trustee.; Filed By: The Richard J Scuba Family Trust Linda Leong Trustee (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/04/2023 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by The Richard J Scuba Family Trust Linda Leong Trustee. Refers to: Wells Fargo Bank NA; Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss; Filed By: The Richard J Scuba Family Trust Linda Leong Trustee (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by The Richard J Scuba Family Trust Linda Leong Trustee. Refers to: Wells Fargo Bank NA; Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss; Filed By: The Richard J Scuba Family Trust Linda Leong Trustee (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less