This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 01:47:11 (UTC).

The Post Housing LP vs Tricorp Construction Inc

Case Summary

On 09/06/2018 The Post Housing LP filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Tricorp Construction Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD L. STYN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD L. STYN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

THE POST HOUSING LP

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

TRICORP CONSTRUCTION INC

TRICORP CONSTRUCTION INC; DBA : TRICORP HEARN CONSTRUCTION SUBCHAPTER S CORPORATION

PENNSYLVANIA COATINGS INC

M. TRUDEAU ELECTRIC INC

INSUL-FLOW INC

SIDS CARPET BARN INC

THYSSENKRUPP ELEVATOR CORPORATION

THE POST HOUSING LP

M V PLUMBING INC

MAGNESITE SPECIALTIES INC

STRANG HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING INC

A PREMAN ROOFING INC

E BUILD & TRUSS INC

LTD SHEET METAL INC

M J PLASTERING INC

VERDUGO CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION INC

SOUTHWEST WINDOW CO INC

C-ME TRIM COMPANY INC

Magnesite Specialties Inc; DBA : American Deck Systems and Atomic Coatings Inc

MOES 1-300

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

SLEV, MONICA

3555 Fifth Ave #205

San Diego, CA 92103

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

BERRY, PATRICK W

4690 Executive Drive 125

San Diego, CA 92121

WOLFENZON, BRUNO

Attorney at WOLFENZON ROLLE

4690 Executive Drive 125

San Diego, CA 92121

Jeffery, Mona J

Attorney at JEFFERY & GROSFELD LLP

725 W Town And Country Rd #130

Orange, CA 92868

Ryan, Norman A.

CAMPBELL, KURT U

CANNON, CATHERINE M

Attorney at SANTA CRUZ BROWNWOOD & CANNON

1615 Murray Canyon Road 300

San Diego, CA 92108

Brueggemann, Mark B

2150 Park Place 100

El Segundo, CA 90245

Gaffney, Thomas Michael

Attorney at OLSEN & BRUEGGEMANN APC

2150 Park Place 100

El Segundo, CA 90245

SLEV, MONICA

3555 Fifth Ave #205

San Diego, CA 92103

Hall, David M

750 B St Ste 2550

San Diego, CA 92101

MADARIAGA, DAVID B

11845 W Olympic Boulevard 710

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Reden, Justin G

Attorney at REDEN & REDEN APC

16885 Via Del Campo Court 320

San Diego, CA 92127

Ebright, Jeffrey

Attorney at SKANE WILCOX LLP

1230 Columbia Street 800

San Diego, CA 92101

Skane, Elizabeth A

Attorney at SKANE WILCOX LLP

1230 Columbia Street 800

San Diego, CA 92101

Louis, Lena M

9891 Irvine Center Dr

Irvine, CA 92618

Lin, Albert C.

18100 Von Karman Avenue Suite 750

Irvine, CA 92612

Black, John E

Attorney at SPRINGEL & FINK LLP

Ebner, Darren M

Attorney at SPRINGEL & FINK LLP

Other Attorneys

Carvalho, Jeffrey P

8989 Rio San Diego Drive 368

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

Stipulation to Allow Complaint-In-Intervention By Intervener Security National Insurance Company in its Capacity as Insurer of Pennsylvania Development Partners, a Suspended California Corporation

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Joint Stipulation to Allow Complaint-in-Intervention) filed by Security National Insurance Company.

[Proposed] Order Permitting Security National Insurance Company to Intervene in its Capacity as Insurer of Pennsylvania Development Partners, a Suspended California Corporation

Order - Other (Permitting Security National Insurance Company to Intervene in its Capacity as Insurer of Pennsylvania Development Partners (ORDER SIGNED 8/9/19) filed by Security National Insurance Company.

Proposed Order Permitting Security National Insurance Company to Intervene in its Capacity as Insurer of Pennsylvania Development Partners, a Suspended California Corporation

Proposed Order submitted by Security National Insurance Company received but not filed on 08/06/2019.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Security National Insurance Company.

Order for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

Order for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (Signed as Modified) filed by Tricorp Construction Inc; Tricorp Construction Inc.

TRICORP CONSTRUCTION, INC REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST M. TRUDEAU ELECTRIC, INC.

Request for Entry of Default filed by Tricorp Construction Inc. Refers to: M. Trudeau Electric Inc

Clerks Certificate of Electronic Service

Clerks Certificate of Electronic Service (Order Determining Good Faith Settlement of Tricorp Construction Inc ROA# 97) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Answer to ThyssenKrupp Cross-Complaint

Answer filed by The Post Housing LP; Imperial Beach Post No 820 The American Legion Department of California Inc.

TRICORP CONSTRUCTION INC AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT TO NAME ROE CROSS-DEFENDANT, PENNSYLVANIA DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS (ROE 1)

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (ROE 1) filed by Tricorp Construction Inc. Refers to: Pennsylvania Development Partners

Notice - Other [of Change of Handling Attorneys]

Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed by Magnesite Specialties Inc.

Stipulation to Set Aside Default Against M. Trudeau Electric Inc.; [Proposed] Order

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (to Set Aside Default Against M. Trudeau Electric Inc; Order) filed by M. Trudeau Electric Inc; Tricorp Construction Inc; Tricorp Construction Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by M. Trudeau Electric Inc.

Cross-Defendant M. Trudeau Electric Inc.s Answer to Tricorp Construction, Inc.s Cross-Complaint

Answer filed by M. Trudeau Electric Inc.

Summons on Cross-Complaint

Original Summons (Cross Complaint) filed by M. Trudeau Electric Inc.

M. Trudeau Electric Inc.s Cross-Complaint For: 1. Equitable Indemnity; 2. Implied Indemnity; 3. Apportionment of Fault; and 4. Declaratory Relief

Cross-Complaint filed by M. Trudeau Electric Inc. Refers to: QOES 1-50

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (Cross-Complaint) filed by M. Trudeau Electric Inc.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by M J Plastering Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by M J Plastering Inc.

98 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed by Security National Insurance Company. Filed By: Security National Insurance Company (Intervenor)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proposed Order submitted by Security National Insurance Company received but not filed on 08/06/2019. Filed By: Security National Insurance Company (Intervenor)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Other (Permitting Security National Insurance Company to Intervene in its Capacity as Insurer of Pennsylvania Development Partners (ORDER SIGNED 8/9/19) filed by Security National Insurance Company. Filed By: Security National Insurance Company (Intervenor)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Joint Stipulation to Allow Complaint-in-Intervention) filed by Security National Insurance Company. Filed By: Security National Insurance Company (Intervenor)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 08/09/2019 10:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • Status Conference (Civil) continued pursuant to Court's motion to 02/07/2020 at 10:30AM before Judge Ronald L. Styn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Cross-Complaint filed by Sids Carpet Barn Inc. Refers to: Wirtz Quality Installations INC Filed By: Sids Carpet Barn Inc (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons (on Cross Complaint) filed by Sids Carpet Barn Inc. Filed By: Sids Carpet Barn Inc (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (and Order to Permit Sid's Carpet Barn, Inc. to File a Cross-Complaint Against Wirtz Quality Installations, Inc.) filed by Sids Carpet Barn Inc; The Post Housing LP; Tricorp Construction Inc; Tricorp Construction Inc; Strang Heating and Air Conditioning Inc. Filed By: Sids Carpet Barn Inc (Cross - Defendant); The Post Housing LP (Plaintiff); Tricorp Construction Inc (Defendant); Tricorp Construction Inc (Defendant); Strang Heating and Air Conditioning Inc (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
100 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by Tricorp Construction Inc; Tricorp Construction Inc. Filed By: Tricorp Construction Inc (Defendant); Tricorp Construction Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by The Post Housing LP. Refers to: Tricorp Construction Inc Filed By: The Post Housing LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by The Post Housing LP. Refers to: Tricorp Construction Inc Filed By: The Post Housing LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/08/2019 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-74 Ronald L. Styn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Styn, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by The Post Housing LP. Refers to: Tricorp Construction Inc; Tricorp Construction Inc Filed By: The Post Housing LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by The Post Housing LP. Refers to: Tricorp Construction Inc; Tricorp Construction Inc Filed By: The Post Housing LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by The Post Housing LP. Refers to: Tricorp Construction Inc; Tricorp Construction Inc Filed By: The Post Housing LP (Plaintiff); Imperial Beach Post No 820 The American Legion Department of California Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where E BUILD & TRUSS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C-ME TRIM COMPANY INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Tricorp Construction, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Verdugo Concrete Construction Inc is a litigant