This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 07/08/2020 at 09:59:35 (UTC).

The Loren William Odell, Jr. and Mary Lou Odell Trust Dated May 10, 1990

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 The Loren William Odell, Jr and Mary Lou Odell Trust Dated May 10, 1990 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey Bostwick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Jeffrey Bostwick

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Odell III, Loren William

Odell Jr, Cynthia Jean

Not Classified By Court

The Loren William Odell, Jr. and Mary Lou Odell Trust Dated May 10, 1990 [IMAGED]

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Gutman, Tomer Taylor

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing on Petition to Determine Claim to Property

Notice of Hearing on Petition to Determine Claim to Property filed by Odell, Loren William III.

Notice of Hearing on Petition to Determine Claim to Property

Notice of Hearing on Petition to Determine Claim to Property filed by Odell, Loren William III.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Other (Trusts) was rescheduled to 08/05/2020 at 09:00:00 AM in 504 before Jeffrey Bostwick at Central.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Other (Trusts) scheduled for 08/05/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 504 Jeffrey Bostwick.

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts (5/13/20 hearing) filed by Odell, Loren William III.

Probate Code 850 - Petition for Conveyance or Transfer of Property Claimed to Belong to Decedent or Other Person - Trusts

Probate Code 850 - Petition for Conveyance or Transfer of Property Claimed to Belong to Decedent or Other Person - Trusts filed by Odell, Loren William III; Odell, Cynthia Jean Jr. Refers to: The Loren William Odell, Jr. and Mary Lou Odell Trust Dated May 10, 1990 [IMAGED]

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Other (Trusts) scheduled for 05/13/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 504 Jeffrey Bostwick.

Notice of Case Assignment - Probate SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2020
  • HearingLocation: 504; Event Type: Other (Trusts) - Probate Code 850 - Petition for Conveyance or Transfer of Property Claimed to Belong to Decedent or Other Person - Trusts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition to Determine Claim to Property filed by Odell, Loren William III. Filed By: Odell, Loren William III (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition to Determine Claim to Property filed by Odell, Loren William III. Filed By: Odell, Loren William III (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Other (Trusts) was rescheduled to 08/05/2020 at 09:00:00 AM in 504 before Jeffrey Bostwick at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOther (Trusts) scheduled for 08/05/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 504 Jeffrey Bostwick.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts (5/13/20 hearing) filed by Odell, Loren William III. Filed By: Odell, Loren William III (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProbate Code 850 - Petition for Conveyance or Transfer of Property Claimed to Belong to Decedent or Other Person - Trusts filed by Odell, Loren William III; Odell, Cynthia Jean Jr. Refers to: The Loren William Odell, Jr. and Mary Lou Odell Trust Dated May 10, 1990 [IMAGED] Filed By: Odell, Loren William III (Petitioner); Odell, Cynthia Jean Jr (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bostwick, Jeffrey.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOther (Trusts) scheduled for 05/13/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 504 Jeffrey Bostwick.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less