This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/31/2018 at 05:24:30 (UTC).

The Johnson Family Trust dated October 23, 1989

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 The Johnson Family Trust dated October 23, 1989 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JULIA C. KELETY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JULIA C. KELETY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JOHNSON, DIANE

Not Classified By Court

THE JOHNSON FAMILY TRUST DATED OCTOBER 23, 1989

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

BOND, PHILLIP A.

Attorney at BEAMER LAUTH STEINLEY & BOND LLP

401 B Street 1530

San Diego, CA 92101

BOND, STEPHEN A

Attorney at BEAMER LAUTH STEINLEY & BOND LLP

401 B Street 1530

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Supplement to Petition

Supplement to Petition (Supplement to Petition to Appoint Successor Trustee; Petition for Order instructing Trustees to Transfer Trust Assets to Administrator...) filed by Johnson, Diane.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Service by Mail) filed by Johnson, Diane.

Supplement - Other

Supplement - Other (LATE - Second Supplement to Petition to Appointment Successor Trustee; Petition For Order Instructing Trustees to Transfer Trust Assets to Administrator of Estate of James John Journigan) filed by Johnson, Diane.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Petition for Appointment of Successor (Trusts) heard 04/25/2017 09:00:00 AM.

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (Notice Of Entry Of Order Approving Petition For Apointment Of Successor Trustee; Petition For Order Instructing Trustees To Transfer Trust Assets To Administrator Of Estate Of James John Journigan) filed by Johnson, Diane.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Johnson, Diane.

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Belasco, peTER.

Petition for Appointment of Successor Trustee

Petition for Appointment of Successor Trustee (Petition to Appoint Successor Trustee; Petition for Order Instructing Trustees to Transfer Trust Assets to Administrator of Estate of James John Journigan) filed by Johnson, Diane. Refers to: The Johnson Family Trust dated October 23, 1989

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Petition for Appointment of Successor (Trusts) scheduled for 04/25/2017 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in PC-2 Julia C. Kelety.

Notice of Case Assignment - Probate SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Johnson, Diane.

Notice of Related Case

Notice of Related Case filed by Johnson, Diane.

Trust Coversheet

Trust Coversheet filed by Johnson, Diane.

Trust Coversheet

Trust Coversheet filed by Johnson, Diane.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Belasco, peTER. Filed By: Belasco, peTER (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed by Johnson, Diane. Filed By: Johnson, Diane (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (Notice Of Entry Of Order Approving Petition For Apointment Of Successor Trustee; Petition For Order Instructing Trustees To Transfer Trust Assets To Administrator Of Estate Of James John Journigan) filed by Johnson, Diane. Filed By: Johnson, Diane (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Appointment of Successor (Trusts) heard 04/25/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Petition for Appointment of Successor Trustee(Petition to Appoint Successor Trustee; Petition for Order Instructing Trustees to Transfer Trust Assets to Administrator of Estate of James John Journigan) filed by Diane Johnson was granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Supplement - Other (LATE - Second Supplement to Petition to Appointment Successor Trustee; Petition For Order Instructing Trustees to Transfer Trust Assets to Administrator of Estate of James John Journigan) filed by Johnson, Diane. Filed By: Johnson, Diane (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Declaration of Service by Mail) filed by Johnson, Diane. Filed By: Johnson, Diane (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Supplement to Petition (Supplement to Petition to Appoint Successor Trustee; Petition for Order instructing Trustees to Transfer Trust Assets to Administrator...) filed by Johnson, Diane. Filed By: Johnson, Diane (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Trust Coversheet filed by Johnson, Diane. Filed By: Johnson, Diane (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Trust Coversheet filed by Johnson, Diane. Filed By: Johnson, Diane (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Related Case filed by Johnson, Diane. Filed By: Johnson, Diane (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Johnson, Diane. Filed By: Johnson, Diane (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Appointment of Successor (Trusts) scheduled for 04/25/2017 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in PC-2 Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Kelety, Julia.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Appointment of Successor Trustee (Petition to Appoint Successor Trustee; Petition for Order Instructing Trustees to Transfer Trust Assets to Administrator of Estate of James John Journigan) filed by Johnson, Diane. Refers to: The Johnson Family Trust dated October 23, 1989 Filed By: Johnson, Diane (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less