This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/19/2019 at 16:56:24 (UTC).

The Hayes Co., Inc. VS 607 9th Escondido RG, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/02/2019 The Hayes Co , Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 607 9th Escondido RG, LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Earl H. Maas, III. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-NC

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Earl H. Maas, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Hayes Co., Inc.; DBA : Craftsmen Construction

Defendants

Roman Group, LLC

Rosano, Sagiv

607 9th Escondido RG, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zucker II, Lawrence S

Attorney at HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL LLP

402 West Broadway #1850

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by The Hayes Co., Inc..

Complaint for Damages

[A document for ROA# 1]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by The Hayes Co., Inc.. Refers to: 607 9th Escondido RG, LLC; Roman Group, LLC; Rosano, Sagiv

Summons

Original Summons filed by The Hayes Co., Inc.. Refers to: 607 9th Escondido RG, LLC; Roman Group, LLC; Rosano, Sagiv

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/22/2019 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to The Hayes Co., Inc..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Rosano, Sagiv .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Roman Group, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to 607 9th Escondido RG, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by The Hayes Co., Inc.. Filed By: The Hayes Co., Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/22/2019 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Maas, Earl.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by The Hayes Co., Inc.. Refers to: 607 9th Escondido RG, LLC; Roman Group, LLC; Rosano, Sagiv Filed By: The Hayes Co., Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by The Hayes Co., Inc.. Refers to: 607 9th Escondido RG, LLC; Roman Group, LLC; Rosano, Sagiv Filed By: The Hayes Co., Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by The Hayes Co., Inc.. Refers to: 607 9th Escondido RG, LLC; Roman Group, LLC; Rosano, Sagiv Filed By: The Hayes Co., Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAWRENCE S. ZUCKER II