Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 07/24/2020 at 04:46:48 (UTC).

The Blt Trust vs WILLS

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 The Blt Trust filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WILLS. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy M. Casserly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-NC

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Timothy M. Casserly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The BLT Trust

Defendants

Sanches, Sandra

Gomez, Beatriz

Wills, Ann

Wills, Darryl

Sanches, Ferdinand

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Taggart, Timothy L

Attorney at A BLDG BOX

 

Court Documents

Answer

Answer filed by Wills, Ann; Wills, Darryl.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by The BLT Trust. Refers to: Wills, Darryl

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by The BLT Trust. Refers to: Wills, Darryl

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by The BLT Trust. Refers to: Wills, Ann

Complaint

Complaint filed by The BLT Trust. Refers to: Wills, Darryl; Wills, Ann; Sanches, Ferdinand; Sanches, Sandra; Gomez, Beatriz

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by The BLT Trust. Refers to: Wills, Darryl; Wills, Ann; Sanches, Ferdinand; Sanches, Sandra; Gomez, Beatriz

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by The BLT Trust. Refers to: Wills, Darryl; Wills, Ann; Sanches, Ferdinand; Sanches, Sandra; Gomez, Beatriz

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2020
  • HearingLocation: N-31; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Wills, Ann; Wills, Darryl. Filed By: Wills, Ann (Defendant); Wills, Darryl (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by The BLT Trust. Refers to: Wills, Darryl Filed By: The BLT Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by The BLT Trust. Refers to: Wills, Ann Filed By: The BLT Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by The BLT Trust. Refers to: Wills, Darryl Filed By: The BLT Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/06/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by The BLT Trust. Refers to: Wills, Darryl; Wills, Ann; Sanches, Ferdinand; Sanches, Sandra; Gomez, Beatriz Filed By: The BLT Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by The BLT Trust. Refers to: Wills, Darryl; Wills, Ann; Sanches, Ferdinand; Sanches, Sandra; Gomez, Beatriz Filed By: The BLT Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by The BLT Trust. Refers to: Wills, Darryl; Wills, Ann; Sanches, Ferdinand; Sanches, Sandra; Gomez, Beatriz Filed By: The BLT Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Casserly, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAGGART, TIMOTHY L