This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/17/2020 at 01:12:20 (UTC).

Thai vs Shah

Case Summary

On 12/05/2018 Thai filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Shah. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDA TRAPP. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDA TRAPP

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THAI, ANH THI

DANG, UYEN

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BUSH, FREDERICK FRANZ

SHAH, MOHIT

DIRT CHEAP CAR RENTAL

TSG CORPORATION INC; DBA : DIRT CHEAP CAR RENTAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIHILLI, ZEF

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JOSEPH ZEF MIHILLI

6136 Mission Gorge Rd Suite 201

San Diego, CA 92120

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Hurley, Beth

Attorney at SANTA CRUZ BROWNWOOD & CANNON

NAHAVANDIAN, ANAHITA

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ANAHITA HASHEMINEJAD

 

Court Documents

Statement of Agreement/Nonagreement - full agreement

Statement of Agreement/Nonagreement - full agreement filed by PLOTKIN, BARRY M.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 59]

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (Not Entered) filed by Thai, Anh Thi; Dang, Uyen.

Mediator Selection Form

Mediator Selection Form filed by Bush, Frederick Franz.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party (as to TSG Corp only) filed by Thai, Anh Thi; Dang, Uyen. Refers to: TSG CORPORATION INC

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Bush, Frederick Franz. Refers to: Shah, Mohit

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (FREDERICK FRANZ BUSH) filed by Thai, Anh Thi. Refers to: Bush, Frederick

General Denial

General Denial filed by Bush, Frederick Franz.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by Bush, Frederick Franz. Refers to: Shah, Mohit

DEFENDANTS TSG CORPORATION DBA DIRT CHEAP CAR RENTAL AND MOHIT SHAH ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Answer filed by Shah, Mohit; TSG CORPORATION INC.

DEFENDANTS TSG CORPORATION DBA DIRT CHEAP CAR RENTAL AND MOHIT SHAH ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

[Another document for ROA# 20]

TSG CORPORATION DBA DIRT CHEAP CAR RENTAL AND MOHIT SHAHS CROSS-COMPLAINT AGAINST FREDERICK FRANZ BUSH

[Another document for ROA# 20]

General Denial to 1st Amended XC

General Denial filed by Bush, Frederick Franz.

Mohit Shah's Answer to Cross-Complaint of Frederick Franz Bush

Answer filed by Shah, Mohit.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Shah, Mohit.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Thai, Anh Thi; Dang, Uyen. Refers to: Shah, Mohit; Bush, Frederick; Dirt Cheap Car Rental

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (Not Entered) filed by Thai, Anh Thi; Dang, Uyen. Filed By: Thai, Anh Thi (Plaintiff); Dang, Uyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 59]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal filed by Bush, Frederick Franz; TSG CORPORATION INC; Shah, Mohit. Filed By: Bush, Frederick Franz (Cross - Complainant); TSG CORPORATION INC (Cross - Complainant); Shah, Mohit (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Bush, Frederick Franz .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Shah, Mohit .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Bush, Frederick Franz .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Dirt Cheap Car Rental.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Shah, Mohit .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Dang, Uyen .

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (FREDERICK FRANZ BUSH) filed by Thai, Anh Thi. Refers to: Bush, Frederick Filed By: Thai, Anh Thi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 08/23/2019 at 10:20:00 AM in C-70 before Randa Trapp at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/23/2019 at 10:20:00 AM at Central in C-70 Randa Trapp.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Thai, Anh Thi; Dang, Uyen. Refers to: Shah, Mohit; Bush, Frederick; Dirt Cheap Car Rental; TSG CORPORATION INC Filed By: Thai, Anh Thi (Plaintiff); Dang, Uyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Thai, Anh Thi; Dang, Uyen. Refers to: Shah, Mohit; Bush, Frederick; Dirt Cheap Car Rental Filed By: Thai, Anh Thi (Plaintiff); Dang, Uyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Thai, Anh Thi; Dang, Uyen. Refers to: Shah, Mohit; Bush, Frederick; Dirt Cheap Car Rental Filed By: Thai, Anh Thi (Plaintiff); Dang, Uyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Trapp, Randa.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/26/2019 at 10:20:00 AM at Central in C-70 Randa Trapp.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dirt Cheap I, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where TSG Corporation; DBA : Dirt Cheap Car Rental is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HURLEY BETH