This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/29/2019 at 07:17:07 (UTC).

TERRACE GARDENS LLC vs HAMILTON [SHRIVER]

Case Summary

On 01/11/2019 TERRACE GARDENS LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HAMILTON SHRIVER. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Terrace Gardens LLC

Defendant

Hamilton, Keith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Owens, David A

3443 Camino Del Rio South 106

San Diego, CA 92108

Defendant Attorney

Marvel, James W

1764 San Diego Avenue Ste 100

San Diego, CA 92110

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession Returned - Wholly Satisfied

Writ of Possession Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed by Terrace Gardens LLC.

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Terrace Gardens LLC. Refers to: Hamilton, Keith

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Terrace Gardens LLC. Refers to: Hamilton, Keith

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Terrace Gardens LLC. Refers to: Hamilton, Keith

Notice that you have been sued SD

Case initiation form printed.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (Not Entered) filed by Terrace Gardens LLC. Refers to: Hamilton, Keith

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Terrace Gardens LLC. Refers to: Hamilton, Keith

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Terrace Gardens LLC.

Notice to Filing Party SD

The default filed by was denied. Refers to: Hamilton, Keith

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

[Another document for ROA# 11]

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants

[Another document for ROA# 11]

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 11]

Request for Entry of Default

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only

Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only filed by Terrace Gardens LLC. Refers to: Hamilton, Keith

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (includes unknown occupants) filed by Terrace Gardens LLC. Refers to: Hamilton, Keith

Writ of Execution for Possession of the Premises

Writ of Execution for Possession of the Premises submitted by Terrace Gardens LLC received but not filed on 01/30/2019.

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Granted in Whole) filed by Hamilton, Keith.

Notice of Assignment of Shriver Counsel

Notice of Assignment of Shriver Counsel filed by Hamilton, Keith.

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2019
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Hamilton, Keith, on 03/12/2019, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed by Terrace Gardens LLC. Filed By: Terrace Gardens LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 03/12/2019 01:15:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Ex Parte scheduled for 03/12/2019 at 01:15:00 PM at Central in C-60 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (To stay the lockout scheduled for 3/13/19 (D)) filed by Hamilton, Keith. Filed By: Hamilton, Keith (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Assignment of Shriver Counsel filed by Hamilton, Keith. Filed By: Hamilton, Keith (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Granted in Whole) filed by Hamilton, Keith. Filed By: Hamilton, Keith (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Hamilton, Keith. Filed By: Hamilton, Keith (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Writ of Possession issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Judgment entered for Terrace Gardens LLC and against Hamilton, Keith for a grand total of $ 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • The default filed by was denied. Refers to: Hamilton, Keith Filed By: Terrace Gardens LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Terrace Gardens LLC. Filed By: Terrace Gardens LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Terrace Gardens LLC. Refers to: Hamilton, Keith Filed By: Terrace Gardens LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Default (Not Entered) filed by Terrace Gardens LLC. Refers to: Hamilton, Keith Filed By: Terrace Gardens LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Case assigned to Department C-60.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Terrace Gardens LLC. Refers to: Hamilton, Keith Filed By: Terrace Gardens LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Terrace Gardens LLC. Refers to: Hamilton, Keith Filed By: Terrace Gardens LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Terrace Gardens LLC. Refers to: Hamilton, Keith Filed By: Terrace Gardens LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Warren Marvel