This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/15/2023 at 07:10:28 (UTC).

Terashima vs Milum

Case Summary

On 11/16/2022 Terashima filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Milum. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Bacal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Katherine Bacal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Terashima, Tsuki

Defendant

Milum, Brian

San Diego, CA 92104

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rozmus, Tamara Leetham

3990 Old Town Avenue A101

San Diego, CA 92110

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Terashima, Tsuki. Refers to: Milum, Brian

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Terashima, Tsuki. Refers to: Milum, Brian

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Terashima, Tsuki. Refers to: Milum, Brian

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/28/2023 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD generated.

Notice to Litigants SD

Notice to Litigants SD generated.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD generated.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD generated.

Notice of Recorded Pendency of Action

Notice of Recorded Pendency of Action filed by Terashima, Tsuki.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Terashima, Tsuki. Refers to: Milum, Brian

General Denial

General Denial filed by Milum, Brian.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-69; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Milum, Brian.; Filed By: Milum, Brian (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Denial filed by Milum, Brian.; Filed By: Milum, Brian (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Terashima, Tsuki. Refers to: Milum, Brian; Filed By: Terashima, Tsuki (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Recorded Pendency of Action filed by Terashima, Tsuki.; Filed By: Terashima, Tsuki (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Litigants SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/28/2023 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bacal, Katherine.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Terashima, Tsuki. Refers to: Milum, Brian; Filed By: Terashima, Tsuki (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Terashima, Tsuki. Refers to: Milum, Brian; Filed By: Terashima, Tsuki (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Terashima, Tsuki. Refers to: Milum, Brian; Filed By: Terashima, Tsuki (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less