Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 12:38:45 (UTC).

Tebelin vs Mortgageit Inc

Case Summary

On 11/08/2018 Tebelin filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Mortgageit Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH J MEDEL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

KENNETH J MEDEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TEBELIN, AURORA

Defendants

HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR DBALT MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST SERIES 2007-4

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT TITLE ESTATE LIEN OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFFS TITLE OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFFS TITLE THERETO

FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE COMPANY

SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC

MORTGAGEIT INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRAN, HOA VAN

9828 Garden Grove Boulevard 208

Garden Grove, CA 92844

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Mortgageit Inc.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/12/2019 08:30:00 AM.

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (Continued Case Management) filed by Mortgageit Inc; Fidelity National Title Company; HSBC Bank USA National Association as Trustee for Dbalt Mortgage Loan Trust Series 2007-4; Specialized Loan Servicing LLC.

Notice of Dismissal SD

Notice of Dismissal SD generated.

Demurrer

Demurrer (To Complaint) filed by Mortgageit Inc; Fidelity National Title Company; HSBC Bank USA National Association as Trustee for Dbalt Mortgage Loan Trust Series 2007-4; Specialized Loan Servicing LLC.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Tebelin, Aurora.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 07/12/2019 at 08:30:00 AM in C-66 before Kenneth J Medel at Central.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Tebelin, Aurora.

Declaration of non-monetary status

Declaration - Other filed by Fidelity National Title Company.

Summons

Original Summons filed by Tebelin, Aurora. Refers to: Mortgageit Inc; Fidelity National Title Company; HSBC Bank USA National Association as Trustee for Dbalt Mortgage Loan Trust Series 2007-4; Specialized Loan Servicing LLC; All Persons Unknown Claiming Any Legal or Equitable Right Title Estate Lien or Interest in the Property Described in the Complaint Adverse to Plaintiffs Title or Any Cloud on Plaintiffs Title Thereto

Summons

[Another document for ROA# 10]

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Notice of Lis Pendens

Notice of Pendency of Action filed by Tebelin, Aurora.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Tebelin, Aurora. Refers to: Mortgageit Inc; Fidelity National Title Company; HSBC Bank USA National Association as Trustee for Dbalt Mortgage Loan Trust Series 2007-4; Specialized Loan Servicing LLC

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Complaint

[Another document for ROA# 6]

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment of Dismissal filed by All Persons Unknown Claiming Any Legal or Equitable Right Title Estate Lien or Interest in the Property Described in the Complaint Adverse to Plaintiffs Title or Any Cloud on Plaintiffs Title Thereto; Fidelity National Title Company; HSBC Bank USA National Association as Trustee for Dbalt Mortgage Loan Trust Series 2007-4; Mortgageit Inc; Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. Filed By: All Persons Unknown Claiming Any Legal or Equitable Right Title Estate Lien or Interest in the Property Described in the Complaint Adverse to Plaintiffs Title or Any Cloud on Plaintiffs Title Thereto (Defendant); Fidelity National Title Company (Defendant); HSBC Bank USA National Association as Trustee for Dbalt Mortgage Loan Trust Series 2007-4 (Defendant); Mortgageit Inc (Defendant); Specialized Loan Servicing LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Dismissal SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 08/02/2019 10:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Court ordered entire action dismissed with prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Tentative Ruling for Demurrer / Motion to Strike published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (Continued Case Management) filed by Mortgageit Inc; Fidelity National Title Company; HSBC Bank USA National Association as Trustee for Dbalt Mortgage Loan Trust Series 2007-4; Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. Filed By: Mortgageit Inc (Defendant); Fidelity National Title Company (Defendant); HSBC Bank USA National Association as Trustee for Dbalt Mortgage Loan Trust Series 2007-4 (Defendant); Specialized Loan Servicing LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/12/2019 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Civil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to Court's motion to 08/02/2019 at 10:30AM before Judge Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Mortgageit Inc. Filed By: Mortgageit Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Demurrer (To Complaint) filed by Mortgageit Inc; Fidelity National Title Company; HSBC Bank USA National Association as Trustee for Dbalt Mortgage Loan Trust Series 2007-4; Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. Filed By: Mortgageit Inc (Defendant); Fidelity National Title Company (Defendant); HSBC Bank USA National Association as Trustee for Dbalt Mortgage Loan Trust Series 2007-4 (Defendant); Specialized Loan Servicing LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • [Another document for ROA# 8]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Pendency of Action filed by Tebelin, Aurora. Filed By: Tebelin, Aurora (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • E-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • [Another document for ROA# 6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • [Another document for ROA# 6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/05/2019 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Medel, Kenneth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Tebelin, Aurora. Refers to: Mortgageit Inc; Fidelity National Title Company; HSBC Bank USA National Association as Trustee for Dbalt Mortgage Loan Trust Series 2007-4; Specialized Loan Servicing LLC Filed By: Tebelin, Aurora (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Tebelin, Aurora. Refers to: Mortgageit Inc; Fidelity National Title Company; HSBC Bank USA National Association as Trustee for Dbalt Mortgage Loan Trust Series 2007-4; Specialized Loan Servicing LLC; All Persons Unknown Claiming Any Legal or Equitable Right Title Estate Lien or Interest in the Property Described in the Complaint Adverse to Plaintiffs Title or Any Cloud on Plaintiffs Title Thereto Filed By: Tebelin, Aurora (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE GROUP A BUSINESS ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases where MORTGAGEIT INC. A NEW YORK CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Specialized Loan Servicing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HSBC Bank USA, N.A. is a litigant