This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/27/2020 at 03:44:36 (UTC).

TD Bank USA NA vs. Nunnink

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 TD Bank USA NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Nunnink. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD Bank USA NA

Defendant

Nunnink, Felicia A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Berk, Camryn P

Attorney at RAUSCH STURM

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by TD Bank USA NA.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by TD Bank USA NA. Refers to: Nunnink, Felicia

Declaration of Non-Service

Declaration of Non-Service filed by TD Bank USA NA. Refers to: Nunnink, Felicia

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by TD Bank USA NA. Refers to: Nunnink, Felicia

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by TD Bank USA NA. Refers to: Nunnink, Felicia

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by TD Bank USA NA. Filed By: TD Bank USA NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Nunnink, Felicia A .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to TD Bank USA NA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service filed by TD Bank USA NA. Refers to: Nunnink, Felicia Filed By: TD Bank USA NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by TD Bank USA NA. Refers to: Nunnink, Felicia Filed By: TD Bank USA NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by TD Bank USA NA. Refers to: Nunnink, Felicia Filed By: TD Bank USA NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by TD Bank USA NA. Refers to: Nunnink, Felicia Filed By: TD Bank USA NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.