This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/02/2022 at 07:14:15 (UTC).

TAVERA VS THE KROGER CO

Case Summary

On 11/03/2021 TAVERA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against THE KROGER CO. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory W Pollack. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory W Pollack

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tavera, Edgar Gael

Defendants

BRIZEIDA

THE KROGER CO; DBA : FOOD FOR LESS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cervantes, J Antonio

Attorney at CERVANTES HODGES LAW FIRM

333 H Street 5000

Chula Vista, CA 91910

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Tavera, Edgar Gael. Refers to: THE KROGER CO; BRIZEIDA

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Tavera, Edgar Gael. Refers to: THE KROGER CO; BRIZEIDA

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Tavera, Edgar Gael. Refers to: THE KROGER CO; BRIZEIDA

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Tavera, Edgar Gael.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-71; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Tavera, Edgar Gael. Filed By: Tavera, Edgar Gael (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/08/2022 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Tavera, Edgar Gael. Refers to: THE KROGER CO; BRIZEIDA Filed By: Tavera, Edgar Gael (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Tavera, Edgar Gael. Refers to: THE KROGER CO; BRIZEIDA Filed By: Tavera, Edgar Gael (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Tavera, Edgar Gael. Refers to: THE KROGER CO; BRIZEIDA Filed By: Tavera, Edgar Gael (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CERVANTES, J ANTONIO