This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/14/2023 at 02:11:16 (UTC).

TAPIA ENTERPRISES INC vs ABYAN PROPERTIES LLC

Case Summary

On 07/06/2022 TAPIA ENTERPRISES INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ABYAN PROPERTIES LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew C. Braner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Matthew C. Braner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAPIA ENTERPRISES INC; DBA : TAPIA BROTHERS COMPANY

Defendants

Abyan Properties LLC; DBA : Tacos El Cabron

BEHAR, JAIME ; AKA : BEHAR, JAIME DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sherman, Marlee Elise

21112 Ventura Blvd

Woodland Hills, CA 91364

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by TAPIA ENTERPRISES INC. Refers to: BEHAR, JAIME; Abyan Properties LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by TAPIA ENTERPRISES INC. Refers to: BEHAR, JAIME; Abyan Properties LLC

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by TAPIA ENTERPRISES INC. Refers to: BEHAR, JAIME; Abyan Properties LLC

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by TAPIA ENTERPRISES INC. Refers to: Abyan Properties LLC

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by TAPIA ENTERPRISES INC. Refers to: BEHAR, JAIME

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by TAPIA ENTERPRISES INC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by TAPIA ENTERPRISES INC.; Filed By: TAPIA ENTERPRISES INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by TAPIA ENTERPRISES INC. Refers to: BEHAR, JAIME; Filed By: TAPIA ENTERPRISES INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by TAPIA ENTERPRISES INC. Refers to: Abyan Properties LLC; Filed By: TAPIA ENTERPRISES INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/06/2023 at 11:15:00 AM at Central in C-60 Matthew C. Braner.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Braner, Matthew.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by TAPIA ENTERPRISES INC. Refers to: BEHAR, JAIME; Abyan Properties LLC; Filed By: TAPIA ENTERPRISES INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by TAPIA ENTERPRISES INC. Refers to: BEHAR, JAIME; Abyan Properties LLC; Filed By: TAPIA ENTERPRISES INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by TAPIA ENTERPRISES INC. Refers to: BEHAR, JAIME; Abyan Properties LLC; Filed By: TAPIA ENTERPRISES INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less