This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/21/2023 at 12:58:25 (UTC).

Tanner vs Schweitzer

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 Tanner filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Schweitzer. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John S. Meyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

John S. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tanner, LaDawn

Defendants

Schweitzer, Abhay

Ideal Environment LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STRECKER, MARC S

Defendant Attorneys

Rozmus, Tamara Leetham

Najjar, George Richard

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Tanner, LaDawn. Refers to: Schweitzer, Abhay

Answer by Defendant Ideal Environment LLC

Answer filed by Ideal Environment LLC.

Peremptory Challenge Ideal Env LLC

Peremptory Challenge filed by Ideal Environment LLC.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/24/2023 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Judge Pollack, Gregory W to John Meyer effective 02/02/2023

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 01/06/2023 08:45:00 AM.

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (Doe 1) filed by Tanner, LaDawn. Refers to: Ideal Environment LLC

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) heard 12/16/2022 09:30:00 AM.

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Teri Smith, CSR#7949 (619-517-0096)) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

OBJECTIONS OF PLAINTIFF LADAWN TANNER TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED BY DEFENDANT ABHAY SCHWEITZER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Objections filed by Tanner, LaDawn.

Tentative Rulings

Tentative Ruling for Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) published.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Schweitzer, Abhay.

Reply to Opposition of Motion for Relief

Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Schweitzer, Abhay.

Declaration of Tamara Leetham In Opposition to Continuance

Declaration - Other filed by Schweitzer, Abhay.

Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Khesraw Karmand

Objections filed by Schweitzer, Abhay.

101 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Ideal Environment LLC.; Filed By: Ideal Environment LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/24/2023 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Judge Pollack, Gregory W to John Meyer effective 02/02/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference (Civil) scheduled for 03/17/2023 at 08:45:00 AM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPeremptory Challenge filed by Ideal Environment LLC.; Filed By: Ideal Environment LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 01/06/2023 08:45:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference (Civil) continued pursuant to party's motion to 03/17/2023 at 08:45AM before Judge Gregory W Pollack.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (Doe 1) filed by Tanner, LaDawn. Refers to: Ideal Environment LLC; Filed By: Tanner, LaDawn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
122 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to party's motion to 03/05/2021 at 01:30PM before Judge Gregory W Pollack.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Tanner, LaDawn.; Filed By: Tanner, LaDawn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case filed by Tanner, LaDawn.; Filed By: Tanner, LaDawn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/08/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Tanner, LaDawn. Refers to: Schweitzer, Abhay; Filed By: Tanner, LaDawn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Tanner, LaDawn. Refers to: Schweitzer, Abhay; Filed By: Tanner, LaDawn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Tanner, LaDawn. Refers to: Schweitzer, Abhay; Ideal Environment LLC; Filed By: Tanner, LaDawn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less